EP3396483 - CONTROL PANEL HAVING NC FUNCTION FOR MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kitamura Machinery Co., Ltd. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi, Toyama 939-1192 / JP | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAMURA Akihiro c/o KITAMURA MACHINERY CO. LTD. 1870 Toide Komyoji Takaoka-shi Toyama 939-1192 / JP | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 17815295.5 | 16.06.2017 | [2018/44] | WO2017JP22299 | Priority number, date | JP20160121420 | 20.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016121420 | [2018/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017221827 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3396483 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3396483 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/414, G05B19/4155, G05B19/408 | [2019/32] | CPC: |
G05B19/408 (EP,US);
G05B19/4147 (US);
G05B19/414 (EP,US);
G05B19/4155 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35481 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36169 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | G05B19/414, G05B19/4155 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENFELD MIT NC-FUNKTION FÜR EINE WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2018/44] | English: | CONTROL PANEL HAVING NC FUNCTION FOR MACHINE TOOL | [2018/44] | French: | TABLEAU DE COMMANDE AYANT UNE FONCTION DE CN POUR MACHINE-OUTIL | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2018 | Translation filed | 22.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 22.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5408076 (GRIFFANTI NELLO [IT]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [I]EP2849012 (DMG MORI SEIKI AG [DE], et al) [I] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015134115 (GONG SHERMAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0024] , [0027]; figure 1B *; | [A]DE102014102531 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] , [0022] - [0024]; figure 2 * | International search | [Y]JPH01246042 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP) [Y] 1-2 * , page 3, upper left column, lines 3 to 17; fig. 1 to 2 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH0273208U (Okuma Machinery Works Ltd.) [Y] 1-2 * , specification, page 10, line 6 to page 13, line 11; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH06168018 (NIPPEI TOYAMA CORP) [A] 1-2 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2000039908 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1-2 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0004], [0009], [0027], [0047] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP3187969U (Kitamura Machinery Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-2 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014057854 (CITIZEN HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-2* , paragraph [0067] & US 2015/0227134 A1 paragraph [0126] & EP 2908200 A1 & CN 104718505 A & KR 10-2015-0054963 A *; | [Y]WO2015190193 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-2 * , paragraphs [0017] to [0035], [0042] to [0044], [0054], [0066] to [0074]; fig. 1 to 7 & US 2017/0139397 A1 paragraphs [0021] to [0040], [0047] to [0049], [0059], [0071] to [0079]; fig. 1 to 7B & CN 106255931 A * | Examination | US7353995 | by applicant | JP2006039903 | JP3187969U |