EP3475229 - SYSTEM FOR TREATING A FLUID WITH NON-MERCURY-BASED UV LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PureFize Technologies AB Virdings Allé 32 B 754 50 Uppsala / SE | [2023/11] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states LightLab Sweden AB Virdings Allé 32 B 754 50 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIRÉN, Jonas Vikingagatan 44C SE-753 34 Uppsala / SE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17815816.8 | 20.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017SE50674 | Priority number, date | SE20160050889 | 22.06.2016 Original published format: SE 1650889 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017222459 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3475229 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3475229 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/32, A61L9/20, H01J61/00, C09K11/77 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
C02F1/325 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/32 (SE);
A61L2/10 (CN,US);
A61L9/20 (SE,US);
A61L2/26 (CN,US);
C09K11/7709 (EP,US);
C09K11/7777 (EP,US);
C09K11/778 (EP,US);
H01J61/00 (SE);
H01J61/20 (US);
H01J61/44 (US);
A61L2202/11 (US);
A61L2202/122 (US);
A61L2202/14 (US);
A61L2209/111 (US);
A61L2209/12 (US);
C02F2201/32 (CN);
C02F2201/322 (CN);
C02F2201/3222 (EP,SE,US);
C02F2201/3223 (EP,US);
C02F2201/3227 (EP,SE,US);
C02F2201/326 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/328 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2303/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | C02F1/32, A61L9/20, H01J61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINES FLUIDS MIT NICHT AUF QUECKSILBER BASIERENDEM UV-LICHT | [2019/18] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TREATING A FLUID WITH NON-MERCURY-BASED UV LIGHT | [2019/18] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'UN FLUIDE AVEC UNE LUMIÈRE UV NON À BASE DE MERCURE | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 13.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2023 | CZ | 08.11.2023 | DK | 08.11.2023 | EE | 08.11.2023 | ES | 08.11.2023 | HR | 08.11.2023 | LT | 08.11.2023 | LV | 08.11.2023 | PL | 08.11.2023 | RO | 08.11.2023 | RS | 08.11.2023 | SK | 08.11.2023 | SM | 08.11.2023 | BG | 08.02.2024 | NO | 08.02.2024 | GR | 09.02.2024 | IS | 08.03.2024 | PT | 08.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
CZ | 08.11.2023 | ||
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RO | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
EE | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
DK | 08.11.2023 | ||
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
SM | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
LV | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
PL | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
HR | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
RS | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
NO | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 08.11.2023 | |
ES | 08.11.2023 | ||
LT | 08.11.2023 | ||
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
PT | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 08.11.2023 | |
BG | 08.02.2024 | ||
GR | 09.02.2024 | ||
IS | 08.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 09.02.2024 | |
IS | 08.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1874895 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]WO2008156813 (UVCLEANING SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* page 19; claims 1-4 *; | [XI]JP2011055898 (NAGOYA INST TECHNOLOGY, et al) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] * [I] 2,6-15; | [XPA]WO2017003347 (LIGHTLAB SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [XP] 1,9,12,14,15 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 3; claims 1,6,8,9,11 * [A] 2-8,10,11,13 | International search | [A]US6447721 (HORTON III ISAAC B [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract *; | [A]WO2008156813 (UVCLEANING SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; figure 1; claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE102010005893 (THERMO ELECTRON LED GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; figure 1; claims 1,8; paragraphs [0006],[0021 ]-[0022],[0047],[0055] *; | [A] - GAWANDE, AB et al., "Luminescence improvement in Pr3+ and Gd3+ activated Sr2Mg(BO3)2 inorganic phosphor", In Materials Research Bulletin, (20140000), vol. 60, pages 285 - 291, XP029114100 [A] 1-18 * ; abstract; introduction section * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.materresbull.2014.08.053 |