EP3472623 - EXOSOME-GUIDED TREATMENT OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nant Holdings IP, LLC 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City, CA 90232 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOON-SHIONG, Patrick 9920 Jefferson Boulevard Culver City California 90232 / US | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | Hutter, Anton, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17816131.1 | 21.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US38515 | Priority number, date | US201662352753P | 21.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352753 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017223186 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472623 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/6842 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/5076 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
G01N2560/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | EXOSOMGESTEUERTE BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2019/17] | English: | EXOSOME-GUIDED TREATMENT OF CANCER | [2019/17] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU CANCER GUIDÉ PAR EXOSOME | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - PISITKUN TRAIRAK ET AL, "Identification and proteomic profiling of exosomes in human urine", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20040907), vol. 101, no. 36, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0403453101, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 13368 - 13373, XP002573117 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 13373, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0403453101 | [Y] - HOORN ET AL, "Prospects for urinary proteomics: exosomes as a source of uri nary biomarkers", NEPHROLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENCE, CARLTON, AU, vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1440-1797.2005.00387.X, ISSN 1320-5358, (20050601), pages 283 - 290, (20050401), XP008139623 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1440-1797.2005.00387.x | [X] - HUILIN SHAO ET AL, "Protein typing of circulating microvesicles allows real-time monitoring of glioblastoma therapy", NATURE MEDICINE, New York, (20121111), vol. 18, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nm.2994, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 1835 - 1840, XP055646100 [X] 1-4,6,7,9,12-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm.2994 | [Y] - DOUGLAS BRUBAKER ET AL, "DRUG INTERVENTION RESPONSE PREDICTIONS WITH PARADIGM (DIRPP) IDENTIFIES DRUG RESISTANT CANCER CELL LINES AND PATHWAY MECHANISMS OF RESISTANCE", BIOCOMPUTING 2014, (20131101), doi:10.1142/9789814583220_0013, ISBN 978-981-4583-22-0, pages 125 - 135, XP055562160 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1142/9789814583220_0013 | [X] - HYUNGSOON IM ET AL, "Label-free detection and molecular profiling of exosomes with a nano-plasmonic sensor", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20140420), vol. 32, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nbt.2886, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 490 - 495, XP055207677 [X] 1-3,6,7,9,12-15 * page 492, column l, paragraph 2 - page 493, column r, paragraph 2; figures 1,2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2886 | International search | [X]WO2015085096 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1-3, 16-32, 40-54 , 57-60 * See paragraphs [0005], [0015], [0027], [0042], [0064], [0069]-[0070], [0074]-[0079], [0172]-[0180]; and claims 9-11, 15, 20, 37, 39. *; | [A]US2015218651 (LYDEN DAVID C [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 16-32, 40-54 , 57-60 * See abstract; and paragraphs [0035], [0039], [0052], [0057]. *; | [A] - HONG et al., "Plasma exosomes as markers of therapeutic response in patients with acute myeloid leukemia", Frontiers in Immunology, (20140410), vol. 5, no. 160, pages 1 - 9, XP055449474 [A] 1-3, 16-32, 40-54 , 57-60 * See pages 1-3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fimmu.2014.00160 | [A] - ZHANG et al., "Exosomes for immunoregulation and therapeutic intervention in cancer", Journal of Cancer, (20160525), vol. 7, pages 1081 - 1087, XP055449482 [A] 1-3, 16-32, 40-54 , 57-60 * See page 1081. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/jca.14866 | [A] - MITCHELL et al., "Can urinary exosomes act as treatment response markers in prostate cancer", Journal of Translational Medicine, (20090112), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1 - 13, XP021050769 [A] 1-3, 16-32, 40-54 , 57-60 * See page 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1479-5876-7-4 |