EP3471727 - CXCR4 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states X4 Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 955 Massachusetts Avenue 4th Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURQUE, Elyse Marie Josee 162 Ch Bouffard L'Etang-du-Nord, Quebec G4T 3G6 / CA | 02 /
SKERLJ, Renato 12 Crocker Circle West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
BOURQUE, Elyse Marie Josee 3115 Racine Street Unit 214 Bellingham, Washington 98226 / US | ||
02 /
SKERLJ, Renato 12 Crocker Circle West Newton, Massachusetts 02465 / US | Representative(s) | Tostmann, Holger Carl Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17816163.4 | 21.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017US38609 | Priority number, date | US201662352820P | 21.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662352820 P | US201762456526P | 08.02.2017 Original published format: US 201762456526 P | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017223239 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471727 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3471727 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K31/437, C07D471/04, A61P35/00 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D519/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/17] | A61K31/445, A61K31/437, C07D471/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CXCR4-INHIBITOREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/17] | English: | CXCR4 INHIBITORS AND USES THEREOF | [2019/17] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE CXCR4 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20212271.9 / EP3808748 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2017 | AL | 09.12.2020 | AT | 09.12.2020 | CY | 09.12.2020 | CZ | 09.12.2020 | DK | 09.12.2020 | EE | 09.12.2020 | FI | 09.12.2020 | HR | 09.12.2020 | LT | 09.12.2020 | LV | 09.12.2020 | MC | 09.12.2020 | MK | 09.12.2020 | PL | 09.12.2020 | RO | 09.12.2020 | RS | 09.12.2020 | SI | 09.12.2020 | SK | 09.12.2020 | SM | 09.12.2020 | TR | 09.12.2020 | BG | 09.03.2021 | NO | 09.03.2021 | GR | 10.03.2021 | IS | 09.04.2021 | PT | 09.04.2021 | LU | 21.06.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 21.06.2017 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
MK | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.06.2017 | |
AL | 09.12.2020 | ||
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CY | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 21.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
MC | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
DK | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SI | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 09.12.2020 | |
AT | 09.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IS | 09.04.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
PL | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 09.12.2020 | |
CZ | 09.12.2020 | ||
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
EE | 09.12.2020 | ||
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 09.12.2020 | |
FI | 09.12.2020 | ||
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RO | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SK | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LT | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
PT | 09.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
SM | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
HR | 09.12.2020 | ||
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
LV | 09.12.2020 | ||
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
BG | 09.03.2021 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
GR | 10.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 09.12.2020 | |
RS | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007087548 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * example - * * claim - * * claim 40 *; | [A]WO2012049277 (PROXIMAGEN LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * example - * * claim - * * claim 20 *; | [A]US2012141471 (SALVINO JOSEPH M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] * * example - * * claim - ** claim 6 * | International search | [A]US7592351 (SUNDERMANN BERND [DE], et al) [A] 1* entire document *; | [A]US2011206607 (OLSSON ROGER [SE], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *; | [A]WO2015200341 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *; | [A] - PUBCHEM, (20141021), Database accession no. 219642471, XP055449556 [A] 1 * entire document * | by applicant | FR901228 | WO0142246 | WO02088112 | US6552065 | WO03063794 | WO2004019973 | WO2004089925 | WO2004106328 | WO2005007623 | WO2005113554 | WO2006078846 | WO2006122806 | WO2007016176 | WO2007044729 | WO2007053452 | WO2007070514 | WO2007084786 | WO2007129161 | WO2008039218 | US7390799 | WO2008109943 | WO2008118802 | WO2009114512 | WO2011090760 | US8138347 | US8906682 | - VANHARANTA et al., Nat Med, (20130000), vol. 19, pages 50 - 56 | - GALEMCCOLL, BioEssays, (19990000), vol. 21, pages 17 - 28 | - HIGHFILL et al., Sci Transl Med, (20140000), vol. 6, page ra67 | - FACCIABENE et al., Nature, (20110000), vol. 475, pages 226 - 230 | - S. M. BERGE et al., pharmaceutically acceptable salts in detail in J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - MCDERMOTT et al., Blood, (20100000), vol. 116, pages 2793 - 2802 | - MACIEJWESKI-DUVAL et al., J. Leukoc. Biol., (20150000), pages 5MA0815 - 288R | - CONNOLLY et al., Int'l J. Biological Sciences, (20120000), vol. 8, pages 964 - 978 | - OKAZAKI, T. et al., Nat. Immunol., (20130000), vol. 14, pages 1212 - 1218 | - ZOU et al., Sci. Transl. Med., (20160000), vol. 8 | - "Principles of Radiation Therapy, Cancer", Principles and Practice of Oncology, Hellman, (19930000), vol. 1, pages 248 - 275 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methods of Organic Synthesis, Thieme, (19520000), vol. 21 |