EP3474919 - MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT | ||
[2023/51] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, FI, GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. 920 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Daniel 920 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 02 /
EGLEY, Bert, D. 920 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew John Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/13] |
Former [2019/18] | White, Andrew John Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street GB-London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17816266.5 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017US38938 | Priority number, date | US201615191945 | 24.06.2016 Original published format: US201615191945 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017223404 | Date: | 28.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474919 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3474919 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/63, A61M1/14, A61B5/00, A61M1/16, A61M1/28, G16H20/17, G16H50/30 | [2020/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/4839 (EP,US);
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61B5/7275 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (EP,US);
A61M1/06 (US);
A61M1/152 (EP,US);
A61M1/154 (EP,US);
A61M1/155 (EP,US);
A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
G16H50/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/1601 (EP,US);
A61M1/282 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3576 (EP,US);
A61M2205/42 (EP,US);
A61M2205/502 (EP,US);
A61M2230/06 (EP,US);
A61M2230/10 (EP,US);
A61M2230/42 (EP,US);
A61M2230/50 (EP,US);
A61M2230/63 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | A61M1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANAGEMENT VON NÄCHTLICHEN THERAPIEN | [2023/51] | English: | MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT | [2023/51] | French: | GESTION DE TRAITEMENT NOCTURNE | [2023/51] |
Former [2019/18] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DAS MANAGEMENT VON NÄCHTLICHEN THERAPIEN | ||
Former [2019/18] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANAGING NOCTURNAL TREATMENT | ||
Former [2019/18] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TRAITEMENT NOCTURNE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 23.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007175827 (WARIAR RAMESH [US]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0026] , [0037] *; | [XI]US2013184638 (SCARPACI JACOB W [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] , [0218] - [0220] - [0249] , [0382] , [0590]; figure 1 * [I] 5-13 | International search | [Y]US2009114582 (GRANT KEVIN L [US], et al) [Y] 3 * , entire document, especially para [0060], [0100] *; | [YA]US2009294339 (BIEWER JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 20-21, 23-24 * , entire document, especially fig 1, 3-5; para [0046], [0059]-[0062], [0066]-[0068] * [A] 16, 22, 30-32; | [A]US2011082445 (VAN DER HELM WIM [CH], et al) [A] 1-35, 71* , entire document *; | [XYA]US2013184638 (SCARPACI JACOB W [US], et al) [X] 1-2,4-5, 15, 17, 25-29, 33 * , entire document, especially fig 1-2; para [0218]-[0220], [0222], [0231], [0249], [0390], [0392], [0407], [0458]-[0461], [0474], [0508]-[0516], [0590], [0608] * [Y] 3, 10, 12-13, 20-21, 23- 24 [A] 6-9, 11, 14, 16, 18-19, 22, 30-32, 34-35, 71; | [A]US2013277306 (CHAPMAN PAUL R [US], et al) [A] 1-35, 71 * , entire document *; | [YA]US2016074618 (FOOTE ROGER MERVYN LLOYD [AU]) [Y] 10, 12-13 * , entire document, especially para [0060], [0062], [0071], [0073], [0076], [0183]-[0184], [0197], [0221] * [A] 11, 14, 30-32, 71 | by applicant | US2013184638 |