EP3698458 - CONVERTER AND OPERATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÖLLNER, Nicolas Görlitzer Str. 8 91058 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
MESSNER, Johann Kosbacher Weg 6a 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 17816484.4 | 22.11.2017 | [2020/35] | WO2017EP80104 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019101305 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3698458 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/42, H02J3/18, H02J3/36, H02M7/493, H02M7/515, H02M7/757, H02M7/77 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
H02M7/7575 (EP,US);
H02J3/18 (EP);
H02J3/36 (EP);
H02M1/42 (EP);
H02M7/493 (EP,US);
H02M7/515 (EP);
H02M7/77 (EP);
H02M1/4266 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | STROMRICHTERSTATION UND DEREN BETRIEB | [2020/35] | English: | CONVERTER AND OPERATION THEREOF | [2020/35] | French: | STATION DE CONVERSION DE COURANT ET SON FONCTIONNEMENT | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 28.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/02] | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3829759 (THORBORG K) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 1,3-11; | [XYI]US4013937 (PELLY BRIAN R, et al) [X] 5,6 * column 7, line 2 - line 11 * * column 9, line 16 - line 21 * * column 10, line 21 - line 38 * * column 11, line 49 - column 12, line 1 * * column 13, line 48 - line 60 * * figure 3 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 7-11; | [A]EP0290914 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 8-11 * figure 1 *; | [IY]JPH11252790 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1,5-11 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 2,5 * [Y] 2-4; | [A] - LARS-ERIK JUHLIN ET AL, "Parallel Connection of Convertors for HVDC Transmission", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (197805), vol. PAS-97, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TPAS.1978.354542, ISSN 0018-9510, pages 714 - 724, XP011180574 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAS.1978.354542 |