EP3545493 - DETECTION OF IRREGULARITIES USING REGISTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Heimann SAS 36 rue Charles Heller 94400 Vitry Sur Seine / FR | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCIANO, Abraham Smiths Heimann SAS 36 rue Charles Heller 94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR | 02 /
GADI, Najib Smiths Heimann SAS 36 rue Charles Heller 94400 Vitry sur Seine / FR | 03 /
COHEN, Laurent CEREMADE UMR CNRS 7534 Université Paris Dauphine PSL Place du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 75775 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Vienne, Aymeric Charles Emile, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Vienne, Aymeric Charles Emile, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 17817023.9 | 24.11.2017 | [2019/40] | WO2017GB53545 | Priority number, date | GB20160020098 | 28.11.2016 Original published format: GB 201620098 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018096355 | Date: | 31.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3545493 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
G06T7/001 (EP,US);
G06T7/60 (GB,US);
G01V5/00 (GB);
G01V5/20 (EP);
G01V5/22 (US);
G06F16/5838 (GB,US);
G06F16/5854 (GB,US);
G06F16/7837 (GB);
G06T7/0004 (GB);
G06T7/40 (GB,US);
G06F16/583 (GB);
G06T2207/30108 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG VON UNREGELMÄSSIGKEITEN MITTELS REGISTRIERUNG | [2019/40] | English: | DETECTION OF IRREGULARITIES USING REGISTRATION | [2019/40] | French: | DÉTECTION D'IRRÉGULARITÉS À L'AIDE D'UN ENREGISTREMENT | [2019/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/40] | 24.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2016034022 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [X] 1,15,23-30 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5,13,14,16-22 [I] 6-12; | [Y]WO2016107475 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [Y] 2-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2016107474 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [Y] 16-22 * the whole document *; | [P]US2017017667 (CHEN ZHIQIANG [CN], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0042] - [0044]; figure 3 ** paragraphs [0054] - [0059]; figure 5 *; | [P]EP3128496 (UNIV TSINGHUA [CN], et al) [P] * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0061] - [ 0063] - [0065]; figure 6 *; | [P]US2017160426 (LI JIANMIN [CN], et al) [P] * paragraphs [0048] , [ 0053] - paragraph [0056]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0057]; figure 3 *; | [Y] - WAMIQ M AHMED ET AL, "Historical comparison of vehicles using scanned x-ray images", APPLICATIONS OF COMPUTER VISION (WACV), 2011 IEEE WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20110105), doi:10.1109/WACV.2011.5711516, ISBN 978-1-4244-9496-5, pages 288 - 293, XP031913586 [Y] 13,14 * section 4.2, line 14 - end of section * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WACV.2011.5711516 |