EP3551954 - RECUPERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Recair B.V. Spuiweg 28 5145NE Waalwijk / NL | [2019/48] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Recair Holding B.V. Spuiweg 28 5145 NE Waalwijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KASTEREN, Marinus Henricus Johannes c/o Recair Holding B.V. Spuiweg 28 5145 NE Waalwijk / NL | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17817271.4 | 27.11.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017NL50783 | Priority number, date | NL20162017947 | 07.12.2016 Original published format: NL 2017947 | [2019/42] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018106102 | Date: | 14.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551954 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551954 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00, F28F3/04, F28D21/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
F28D9/0037 (EP,US);
F28D21/0003 (US);
F28D21/0014 (EP);
F28F3/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REKUPERATOR | [2019/42] | English: | RECUPERATOR | [2019/42] | French: | RÉCUPÉRATEUR | [2019/42] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 22.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2017 | AL | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 29.07.2020 | |
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | HR | 29.07.2020 | |
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | SE | 29.07.2020 | |
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5927097 (WRIGHT PETER SYDNEY [AU]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US6896043 (DUNN MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1* column 2, lines 44-63 *; | [A]EP1739378 (AUTOKUEHLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *; | [AD]WO2013093375 (ELYT 3 [FR]) [AD] 1-14 * figures 1-5; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2013093375 |