EP3471113 - SHED COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JIANGSU SHENMA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No. 1088 Jiangcheng Road Su-tong Science and Technology Park, Nantong Economic and Technological Develo Jiangsu 226017 / CN | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MA, Bin Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No.1088 Jiangcheng Road Su-tong Science and Technology Park, Nantong Economic and Technological Development Area Nantong Jiangsu 226017 / CN | 02 /
FANG, Jiang Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No.1088 Jiangcheng Road Su-tong Science and Technology Park, Nantong Economic and Technological Development Area Nantong Jiangsu 226017 / CN | 03 /
TANG, Liquan Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No.1088 Jiangcheng Road Su-tong Science and Technology Park, Nantong Economic and Technological Development Area Nantong Jiangsu 226017 / CN | 04 /
JIANG, Jianquan Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No.1088 Jiangcheng Road Su-tong Science and Technology Park, Nantong Economic and Technological Development Area Nantong Jiangsu 226017 / CN | [2019/18] |
Former [2019/17] | 01 /
MA, Bin Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No. 1088 Jiangcheng Road Nantong, Jiangsu 226017 / CN | ||
02 /
FANG, Jiang Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No. 1088 Jiangcheng Road Nantong, Jiangsu 226017 / CN | |||
03 /
TANG, Liquan Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No. 1088 Jiangcheng Road Nantong, Jiangsu 226017 / CN | |||
04 /
JIANG, Jianquan Room 1467, 3rd Building Jiangcheng Research and Development Park No. 1088 Jiangcheng Road Nantong, Jiangsu 226017 / CN | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17817643.4 | 05.12.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017CN114623 | Priority number, date | CN201710768110 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710768110 | [2019/16] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019041619 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471113 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/42, H01B17/52, H01B17/50 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
H01B17/42 (EP);
H01B17/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/16] | H01B17/42, H01B17/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | SCHUPPEN | [2019/16] | English: | SHED COVER | [2019/16] | French: | COUVERCLE DE FOULE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2018 | Translation filed | 03.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 28.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/51] | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4053707 (ELY CYRIL HAROLD ARTHUR, et al) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 *; | [XY]CN2067452U (NANTONG POWER SUPPLY BUREAU [CN]) [X] 1,12 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2-9,11; | [X]JP2012248422 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO INC) [X] 1,10 * figure 6b *; | [XY]CN103545062 (JIANGSU SHENMA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,12 * figures 1,2 *[Y] 2-9,11 |