EP3475852 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FLEXIBLE, HIGH PERFORMANCE STRUCTURED DATA PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anditi Pty Ltd 59 Parry Street Newcastle NSW 2300 / AU | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODWIN, Andrew C/O- Anditi Pty Ltd 75 York Street Teralba New South Wales 2284 / AU | 02 /
POISSANT, Patrick 29 Bellevue Lane Fennell Bay New South Wales 2283 / AU | 03 /
LATHIYA, Shaileshkumar 14 Aquarius Avenue Elermore Vale New South Wales 2287 / AU | 04 /
JAMIESON, Peter 15 Macquarie Street Bolton Point New South Wales 2283 / AU | 05 /
CRAIG, Stephen 25 Curzon Road New Lambton New South Wales 2305 / AU | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB Drottninggatan 11 252 21 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 17818730.8 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017AU50641 | Priority number, date | AU20160902533 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: AU 2016902533 | AU20160904659 | 15.11.2016 Original published format: AU 2016904659 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018000024 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3475852 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/25, G06F16/13 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G06F16/13 (EP,US);
G06F16/258 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP);
G06F9/5027 (US)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR FLEXIBLEN, HOCHLEISTUNGSFÄHIGEN, STRUKTURIERTEN DATENVERARBEITUNG | [2019/18] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FLEXIBLE, HIGH PERFORMANCE STRUCTURED DATA PROCESSING | [2019/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT SOUPLE ET À HAUTES PERFORMANCES DE DONNÉES STRUCTURÉES | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 26.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 08.01.2023 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 29.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 11.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/40] | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.02.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.02.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - Anonymous, "Manifest file", (20151223), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Manifest_file&oldid=696526107, (20190618), XP055597312 [Y] 1-10,15 * page 1 * | [Y] - Sowmya Koneru ET AL, "Resource Allocation Method using Scheduling methods for Parallel Data Processing in Cloud", IJCSIT, International Journal of Computer Science and Information Technologies, Vol. 3 (4), (2012), pages 4625 - 4628, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/c131/b62c704138286029507bc3ba7f08a771134d.pdf, (20190619), XP055598023 [Y] 1-10,15 * abstract * * section II * | International search | [A]US2014156806 (KARPISTSENKO ANDRE [EE], et al) [A] 1-9, 15, 17-21 and 35-36 * Figure 4, paragraphs [0034]-[0039], [0054], [0078]-[0089], [0109]-[0111], [0112]-[0118] *; | [A]US9104695 (CERVELLI DANIEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-9, 15, 17-21 and 35-36* Figure 2, column 2 line 55 - column 3 line 67, column 7 line 15 - column 8 line 42 * |