EP3478112 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SANDAL HAVING CUSTOMISED TOE THONG LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiivv Wearables Inc. 402-134 Abbott Street Vancouver, BC V6B 2K4 / CA | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALMON, Michael c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | 02 /
HARGOVAN, Shamil c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | 03 /
LAWSON, Colin c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | 04 /
FENNELL, Carly c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | 05 /
JADAVJI, Louis-Victor c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | 06 /
BEWZA, Enger c/o Wiivv Canada 402 - 134 Abbott Street Vancouver British Columbia V6B 2K4 / CA | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Kent, Peter Joseph, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17818770.4 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017CA00166 | Priority number, date | US201662356727P | 30.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662356727 P | US201762475099P | 22.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762475099 P | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018000081 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478112 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A43B3/12, A43B9/00, A43D1/00, A43D999/00 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
A43B3/103 (EP,US);
A43B13/12 (EP,US);
A43B3/105 (EP,US);
A43B3/12 (US);
A43B3/26 (EP,US);
A43B9/00 (US);
A43D1/00 (US);
A43D1/02 (EP,US);
A43D1/025 (EP,US);
A43D999/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SANDALE MIT ANGEPASSTER ZEHENRIEMENPOSITION | [2019/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SANDAL HAVING CUSTOMISED TOE THONG LOCATION | [2019/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE SANDALE À EMPLACEMENT PERSONNALISÉ DE LANIÈRE D'ORTEILS | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 20.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS61167803U (NAMIKI KK) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7; | [XI]JPS61167801U (NAMIKI KK) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7; | [XI]JPS61174401U (OKISAI KK) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7; | [XI]WO2009022181 (CLARK C & J INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-11 * page 3, line 11 - page 5, line 28; figures 1-7c * [I] 2-4,7; | [A]US2011099840 (AVENI MICHAEL A [US]) [A] 1-4,7-9* pages 89-107; figures 22-25 * | International search | [A]US7681331 (BATHUM DALE [US]) [A] 1-11 *whole document*; | [A]US2011005102 (LONSWAY ERIC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 *whole document*; | [PX]WO2017089432 (STAUDENMANN WERNER [CH], et al) [PX] 1-11*whole document* |