EP3476914 - WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER, AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Electric Glass Co., Ltd. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-8639 / JP | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJITA Naoki c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP | 02 /
MURATA Takashi c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO. LTD. 7-1 Seiran 2-chome Otsu-shi Shiga 520-8639 / JP | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Tetzner, Michael, et al Tetzner & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | [2024/34] |
Former [2019/18] | Tetzner, Michael, et al TETZNER & PARTNER mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Van-Gogh-Strasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17819819.8 | 08.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017JP21377 | Priority number, date | JP20160126536 | 27.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016126536 | [2019/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018003454 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476914 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3476914 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C03C14/00, C03C3/097, C09K11/77, C03C3/085, C03C3/087, C03C3/091, C03C3/093, C03C3/066, C03C3/095, H01L33/50, G02B5/20, C03C4/12 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
C03C4/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L33/502 (KR,US);
H01L33/501 (CN);
C03C14/00 (CN);
C03C14/006 (EP,KR);
C03C3/062 (US);
C03C3/064 (US);
C03C3/066 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/078 (US);
C03C3/083 (US);
C03C3/085 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/087 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/089 (US);
C03C3/091 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C3/093 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C3/095 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/097 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/00 (US);
C09K11/02 (EP,KR);
C09K11/61 (US);
C09K11/64 (US);
C09K11/72 (US);
C09K11/7718 (US);
C09K11/7731 (US);
C09K11/7733 (US);
C09K11/77348 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/77747 (EP,KR,US);
F21K9/64 (US);
F21S41/141 (KR,US);
F21S41/16 (KR,US);
G02B5/20 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/50 (EP,US);
C03C2201/3423 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/03] | C09K11/02, C03C14/00, C03C3/097, C09K11/77, C03C3/085, C03C3/087, C03C3/091, C03C3/093, C03C3/066 | ||
Former IPC [2019/18] | C09K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENLÄNGENUMWANDLUNGSELEMENT UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2019/18] | English: | WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MEMBER, AND LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME | [2019/18] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDES, ET DISPOSITIF LUMINESCENT CONSTITUÉ À L'AIDE DE CELUI-CI | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2018 | Translation filed | 26.09.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 08.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2011187798 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO); | [XI]US2012057337 (LIEBALD RAINER [DE], et al); | [XI]JP2015199640 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) | International search | [X]JP2011187798 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO); | [A]JP2013193952 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO); | [X]JP2014203852 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO); | [A]WO2014188920 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2015118970 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO); | [X]JP2015199640 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) | by applicant | JP2000208815 | JP2003258308 | JP2007302858 | JP4895541B |