EP3474530 - IMAGE COMPRESSING METHOD, IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING METHOD, IMAGE COMPRESSING DEVICE, IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING DEVICE, IMAGE COMPRESSING PROGRAM PRODUCT, AND IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexpoint Co., Ltd. 1-5-11 Nihonbashi-Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKUMA, Akihiro c/o NEXPOINT Co. Ltd. 1-5-11 Nihonbashi-Horidome-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0012 / JP | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17820042.4 | 23.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017JP23167 | Priority number, date | JP20160127109 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: JP 2016127109 | [2019/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018003685 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474530 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/41, H04N19/507, H04N21/2743, H04N21/4402, H04N21/442, H04N21/44, G06F3/14 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
H04N21/2743 (EP,RU,US);
G06F3/1454 (US);
H04N1/41 (EP,US);
H04N19/503 (RU);
H04N19/507 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/70 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | BILDKOMPRESSIONSVERFAHREN, BILDREKONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN, BILDKOMPRESSIONSVORRICHTUNG, BILDREKONSTRUKTIONSVORRICHTUNG, BILDKOMPRESSIONSPROGRAMMPRODUKT UND REKONSTRUKTIONSPROGRAMMPRODUKT | [2019/17] | English: | IMAGE COMPRESSING METHOD, IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING METHOD, IMAGE COMPRESSING DEVICE, IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING DEVICE, IMAGE COMPRESSING PROGRAM PRODUCT, AND IMAGE RECONSTRUCTING PROGRAM PRODUCT | [2019/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMPRESSION D'IMAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION D'IMAGE, DISPOSITIF DE RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGE, PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME DE COMPRESSION D'IMAGE ET PRODUIT DE PROGRAMME DE RECONSTRUCTION D'IMAGE | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2018 | Translation filed | 03.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 03.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 04.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004003104 (BOSKOVIC RONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0068] - [0076] *; | [Y]EP1635581 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0073] - [0086] *; | [Y]WO2011106937 (BEIJING SUPER DIGITAL TV TECHNOLOGY CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 2,13* the whole document *; | [Y]US8606029 (WONG ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 2,13 * column 2, line 51 - column 22, line 30 * | International search | [Y]JPS50151020 (Hitachi Denshi, Ltd.) [Y] 5 * , page 1, lower right column, line 3 to page 2, upper left column, line 17; fig. 1 '· *; | [A]US2011286529 (MEGGERS JENS [US]) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0024] to [0046]; fig. 2 to 5 & US 8295358 B1 & US 6968012 B1 & US 2007/0171982 A1 *; | [A]JP2013051534 (NEXPOINT CO LTD) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0026] to [0050]; fig. 1 to 7 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014072599 (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 1-3, 5-12 * , paragraphs [0038] to [0039], [0044] to [0047]; fig. 4 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014081866 (FUJIFILM CORP) [Y] 5 * , paragraph [0076]; fig. 9 to 10 & US 2014/0115445 A1 paragraph [0091]; fig. 9 to 10 & CN 103778175 A *; | [Y]WO2014202830 (GURULOGIC MICROSYSTEMS OY [FI]) [Y] 1-3, 5-12 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0006], [0015] to [0038]; fig. 1 to 5 & JP 2016-530750 A & US 2013/0315307 A1 & EP 2816807 A1 & CN 105474644 A * | by applicant | JP2009010871 |