EP3480211 - HANP-FC-CONTAINING MOLECULAR CONJUGATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Company, Limited 3-5-1, Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMOTO, Mitsuhiro c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 02 /
OISHI, Shohei c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 03 /
SEKIGUCHI, Yukiko c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 04 /
CHAYA, Hiroyuki c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 05 /
MIYAUCHI, Ryuki c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | 06 /
HONDA, Takeshi c/o DAIICHI SANKYO COMPANY LIMITED 3-5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8426 / JP | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Arends, William Gerrit Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17820337.8 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017JP24206 | Priority number, date | JP20160131450 | 01.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016131450 | [2019/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018003983 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480211 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/58, A61K38/22, A61K39/395, A61K47/60, A61K47/68, A61P9/04, A61P9/12, A61P13/12, C07K16/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/09, C12P1/00, C12P19/18, C07K16/12, A61P9/10, A61K38/00, A61P9/14 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
A61P9/10 (EP,US);
C07K14/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12P21/005 (CN);
C07K16/283 (US);
A61K38/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/2242 (CN);
A61K39/395 (EP,US);
A61K47/60 (EP,CN,US);
A61K47/68 (EP,US);
A61K47/6811 (CN,KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P9/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P9/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P9/14 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/09 (EP,US);
C12P1/00 (EP,US);
C12P19/18 (EP,US);
C12Y302/01 (EP);
C12Y302/01006 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/12 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | C07K14/58, A61K38/22, A61K39/395, A61K47/60, A61K47/68, A61P9/04, A61P9/12, A61P13/12, C07K16/00, C07K19/00, C12N15/09, C12P1/00, C12P19/18, C07K16/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | HANP-FC-HALTIGES MOLEKULARES KONJUGAT | [2019/19] | English: | HANP-FC-CONTAINING MOLECULAR CONJUGATE | [2019/19] | French: | CONJUGUÉ MOLÉCULAIRE CONTENANT DU HANP-FC | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | Translation filed | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 25.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/47] | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/47] | Divisional application(s) | EP22180755.5 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008079995 (PDL BIOPHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 5 * * claims 1-7 *; | [Y]WO2008154226 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph 78 *; | [Y]EP2949665 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 13 - page 11, paragraph 14 *; | [A] - NESHER MAOZ ET AL, "Reversible pegylation prolongs the hypotensive effect of atrial natriuretic peptide", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1021/BC700294W, ISSN 1043-1802, (20080101), pages 342 - 348, (20071211), XP002493772 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 343; figure 1 * * page 346; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700294w | [T] - MITSUHIRO IWAMOTO ET AL, "Pharmacokinetic and Pharmacodynamic Profiles of Glyco-Modified Atrial Natriuretic Peptide Derivatives Synthesized Using Chemo-enzymatic Synthesis Approaches", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, US, (20180803), vol. 29, no. 8, doi:10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.8b00427, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 2829 - 2837, XP055641868 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.bioconjchem.8b00427 | International search | [A]JP2010514417 (PDL BioPharma, Inc.) [A] 1-18 * , & US 2008/0181903 A1 & WO 2008/079995 A2 & EP 2097091 A2 *; | [A]JP2010530222 (Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH) [A] 1-18 * , 1 & US 2010/0310561 A1 & WO 2008/154226 A1 & EP 2162464 A *; | [Y]WO2014115797 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * , claims; paragraph [0011]; examples 2 to 3; test examples 1 to 3 & US 2016/0017015 A1 claims; paragraph [0017]; examples 2 to 3; test examples & EP 2949665 A1 *; | [A]WO2014157107 (GLYTECH INC [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , & US 2016/0052987 A1 & EP 2982686 A1 *; | [XY]JP2015507925 (University of Maryland, Baltimore) [X] 1, 2, 7-10, 12-14, 17, 18 * , claims; paragraphs [0012], [0068] to [0071], [0074] to [0077]; fig. 4 & US 2015/0087814 A1 claims; paragraphs [0013], [0089] to [0092], [0095] to [0098]; fig. 3 & WO 2013/120066 A1 & EP 2812442 A * [Y] 1-18; | [Y] - SLETTEN, E.M. et al., "From Mechanism to Mouse: A Tale of Two Bioorthogonal Reactions", Acc. Chem. Res., (20110000), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 666 - 676, XP055014258 [Y] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ar200148z | [Y] - Bio-Rad, "Shittetokusuru! Tanpakushitsu seisei vol. 3 [Get to Know! Protein Purification vol.3]", Shittetokusuru! Tanpakushitsu seisei vol. 3 [Get to Know! Protein Purification vol.3], vol. 3, (20141014), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160815090917/HTTP://BLOG.BIOIMPACT.JP/MAILMAGAZINE/BIORAD/-VOL3-2.HTML, (20170908), XP009518762 [Y] 15, 16 | [A] - MEZO, A.R. et al., "Atrial Natriuretic Peptide- Fc, ANP-Fc, Fusion Proteins: Semisynthesis, In Vitro Activity and Pharmacokinetics in Rats", Bioconjug. Chem., (20120000), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 518 - 526, XP055128826 [A] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc200592c | [A] - NESHER, M. et al., "Reversible Pegylation Prolongs the Hypotensive Effect of Atrial Natriuretic Peptide", Bioconjug. Chem., (20080000), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 342 - 348, XP002493772 [A] 1-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc700294w |