EP3479406 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TRANSFER OF MICRO-DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Mingwei 3185 Hostetter Rd. San Jose California 95132 / US | 02 /
GANAPATHIAPPAN, Sivapackia 161 E. Portola Ave. Los Altos California 94022 / US | 03 /
FU, Boyi 1164 McKay Dr. San Jose California 95131 / US | 04 /
NG, Hou T. 4068 Keith Dr. Campbell California 95008 / US | 05 /
PATIBANDLA, Nag B. 3951 Vierra St. Pleasanton California 94566 / US | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17820906.0 | 15.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017US37742 | Priority number, date | US201662356431P | 29.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662356431 P | US201615270763 | 20.09.2016 Original published format: US201615270763 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005118 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479406 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/075, H01L21/677, H01L21/683, H01L21/67, H01L21/60, H01L33/00, // H01L21/66 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H01L21/6835 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67721 (KR);
H01L25/075 (CN);
H01L27/156 (US);
H01L21/67144 (KR);
H01L21/677 (CN);
H01L22/22 (KR,US);
H01L24/741 (US);
H01L24/83 (KR,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L24/98 (KR);
H01L33/0095 (EP,US);
H01L33/48 (US);
H01L22/20 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68322 (EP);
H01L2221/68354 (EP);
H01L2221/68368 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68381 (EP);
H01L2224/7598 (EP,US);
H01L2224/95136 (EP,US);
H01L24/75 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | H01L25/075, H01L21/677 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSFER VON MIKROVORRICHTUNGEN | [2019/19] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TRANSFER OF MICRO-DEVICES | [2019/19] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE TRANSFERT DE MICRO-DISPOSITIFS | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 15.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002064032 (OOHATA TOYOHARU [JP]) [Y] 6,15 * figures 8A-8C, 9, 10 ** paragraphs [0072] , [0 73] , [0 74] *; | [XYI]US2014191236 (NUZZO RALPH G [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * figures 2, 3A-3C * * paragraphs [0153] , [ 154] * [Y] 6,15 [I] 1-3,8-10 | International search | [A]US2006035164 (SCHAPER CHARLES D [US]) [A] 1-15* See claims 48-52 and figures 5-8. *; | [A]US2013130440 (HU HSIN-HUA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraph [0014], claim 1 and figure 29. *; | [A]US2013273695 (MENARD ETIENNE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See claims 4,8 and figure 1. *; | [A]US2014267683 (BIBL ANDREAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0021] and claim 1. *; | [A]US2016144608 (CHANG PEI-YU [TW]) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0041] and figures 9A-9B. * | by applicant | US2014191236 |