EP3476043 - MATCHING NETWORKS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER AND RELATED TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of Colorado, A Body Corporate 1800 Grant Street, 8th Floor Denver, CO 80203 / US | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINHA, Sreyam 2300 Arapahoe Ave. 104 Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ashish 2300 Arapahoe Ave. 104 Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | 03 /
AFRIDI, Khurram K. 2300 Arapahoe Ave. 104 Boulder Colorado 80302 / US | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 17821027.4 | 26.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017US39327 | Priority number, date | US201662354796P | 26.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662354796 P | US201762450495P | 25.01.2017 Original published format: US 201762450495 P | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005383 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476043 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/01, H03H7/38, // H03F3/68, H03F3/04, H03F3/60, H02J50/05 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
H03H7/38 (EP,US);
H03H7/40 (US);
H02J50/05 (US);
H02J50/10 (US);
H03H7/0115 (EP);
H02J50/12 (EP);
H03H2260/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | H03F3/68, H03F3/04, H03F3/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSNETZWERKE FÜR DIE DRAHTLOSE ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG UND VERWANDTE TECHNIKEN | [2019/18] | English: | MATCHING NETWORKS FOR WIRELESS POWER TRANSFER AND RELATED TECHNIQUES | [2019/18] | French: | RÉSEAUX D'ADAPTATION POUR TRANSFERT DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL ET TECHNIQUES ASSOCIÉES | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 26.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.04.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2021 | 30.06.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5699071 (URAKAMI KANTA [JP], et al); | [X]US2011163935 (DE JONGH MAURICE [NL], et al); | [X]US2013249650 (BIANCHI GIOVANNI [DE]); | [X]US2013343106 (PERREAULT DAVID J [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US4760350 (AYASLI YALCIN [US]) [Y] 1-10, 12-18 * entire document *; | [A]US7157966 (BAREE ATIQUL [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 12-18* entire document *; | [Y]US2008180178 (GAO HUAI [US], et al) [Y] 1-10, 12-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2009267705 (MORRIS III ARTHUR SHERMAN [US]) [Y] 6, 7 * entire document *; | [A]US2013343106 (PERREAULT DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-10, 12-18 * entire document * | by applicant | US5699071 | US2011163935 | US2013249650 | US2013343106 |