EP3478052 - INSECTICIDAL PROTEINS FROM PLANTS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue P.O. Box 1014 Johnston, Iowa 50131-1014 / US | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARRY, Jennifer 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 02 /
CLARK, Catherine 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 03 /
GERBER, Ryan 2824 Brighton Bluff Drive Apex, North Carolina 27539 / US | 04 /
LUM, Amy 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 05 /
MATHIS, John 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 06 /
ONG, Azalea 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 07 /
PETERSON-BURCH, Brooke 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 08 /
WOLFE, Thomas C. 7250 NW 62ND AVE PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 09 /
XIE, Weiping 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | 10 /
YALPANI, Nasser 35-1450 Union Road Kelowna, BC V1V 3E1 / CA | 11 /
ZHONG, Xiaohong 7250 NW 62ND Avenue PO BOX 552 Johnston, Iowa 50131-0552 / US | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2019/19] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17821042.3 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017US39376 | Priority number, date | US201662357501P | 01.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662357501 P | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005411 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478052 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3478052 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A01H1/00, A01H5/00, A01N63/00, C12N15/09, C12N15/31 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
A01N37/46 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSEKTIZIDPROTEINE AUS PFLANZEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2019/19] | English: | INSECTICIDAL PROTEINS FROM PLANTS AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE | [2019/19] | French: | PROTÉINES INSECTICIDES ISSUES DE PLANTES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR UTILISATION | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 21.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21186172.9 / EP3954202 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2017 | AL | 25.08.2021 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | ES | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | IT | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | MK | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | RS | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | SM | 25.08.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | PT | 27.12.2021 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 25.08.2021 | ||
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
IT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 25.08.2021 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
SM | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
RS | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
PT | 27.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
ES | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]WO2016060948 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]); | International search | [A]US5024837 (DONOVAN WILLIAM P [US], et al); | [A]US2007044179 (STEWART C N JR [US], et al); | [A]US2011277180 (ROMANO CHARLES P [US]); | [A]WO2012006271 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [US], et al); | [A]US2016040184 (CONG RUTH [US], et al); | [A]WO2016060949 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) | by applicant | US3710511 | US3861709 | US4196265 | US4535060 | US4554101 | US4609893 | US4654465 | EP0242246 | EP0242236 | US4713325 | US4714681 | US4716111 | US4716117 | US4720459 | US4727219 | US4761373 | US4769061 | US4810648 | EP0333033 | US4940835 | US4945050 | US4971908 | US4975374 | US5013659 | US5023179 | WO9114778 | US5094945 | US5110732 | WO9213956 | WO9213957 | US5141870 | US5145783 | WO9302197 | US5188960 | US5188642 | WO9311245 | US5240855 | WO9319181 | US5266317 | US5268463 | US5304732 | US5310667 | US5312910 | US5316931 | US5322783 | US5324646 | US5331107 | US5378824 | US5399680 | US5401836 | WO9515392 | WO9516776 | US5428148 | US5432068 | WO9518855 | WO9522625 | US5459252 | US5463175 | US5466785 | US5478369 | WO9601905 | US5489520 | US5491288 | US5496714 | US5510471 | WO9614414 | US5550318 | US5559223 | US5561236 | WO9630517 | US5563055 | WO9633207 | WO9633270 | US5569597 | US5576195 | US5580852 | WO9638560 | US5589367 | EP0752008 | US5604121 | US5605793 | US5605011 | US5608149 | US5608144 | US5608142 | US5607914 | WO9710339 | US5627061 | US5633363 | US5633435 | US5633448 | US5633436 | WO9720078 | US5646024 | US5648477 | WO9729123 | US5659026 | WO9735966 | WO9740162 | US5689052 | US5689035 | WO9749811 | US5716820 | US5723323 | WO9809521 | US5731180 | US5736369 | US5743477 | US5750386 | WO9820133 | WO9822604 | US5763192 | US5767361 | US5767373 | WO9827230 | US5776760 | WO9831837 | WO9832326 | US5789156 | US5792931 | WO9836083 | US5798255 | US5804425 | US5811238 | WO9841653 | WO9841622 | US5814476 | US5814618 | WO9842832 | WO9842727 | WO9842831 | US5817483 | WO9845448 | WO9845458 | US5824514 | US5824524 | US5830721 | US5834247 | US5834252 | US5837458 | US5837876 | US5846818 | US5846812 | US5850016 | US5850014 | WO9856935 | WO9856918 | US5859341 | US5866785 | US5866775 | WO9905298 | US5874265 | WO9909174 | US5877012 | WO9910498 | US5880275 | US5879918 | US5879903 | US5886244 | US5885802 | US5885801 | US5889191 | US5889190 | US5892009 | US5891859 | WO9921979 | WO9923107 | WO9924581 | WO9925821 | WO9925854 | WO9925840 | WO9925855 | WO9925853 | US5912414 | WO9929902 | WO9929882 | WO9931248 | US5919675 | US5928937 | US5929305 | US5932782 | EP0932670 | WO9938977 | WO9940209 | US5939599 | WO9941402 | WO9941383 | WO9941369 | WO9941368 | WO9943838 | WO9943819 | WO9949064 | US5965705 | US5969213 | WO9953050 | US5976862 | WO9955882 | US5981840 | US5986177 | US5990389 | WO9961632 | USRE36449E | WO9964579 | WO0000632 | WO0004190 | US6023013 | WO0006341 | WO0009679 | US6033874 | WO0012733 | US6040497 | WO0018906 | US6048838 | US6060594 | US6063597 | US6063947 | WO0028058 | US6072050 | WO0032761 | US6077824 | US6080913 | US6083499 | US6083736 | US6084153 | WO0042561 | WO0042559 | WO0042560 | WO0044918 | WO0046358 | US6107279 | US6107547 | US6127180 | US6127600 | US6130366 | WO0060089 | US6137033 | WO0068393 | WO0073475 | WO0104147 | US6177611 | US6177616 | US6177275 | WO0112731 | WO0112825 | WO0112800 | US6197561 | WO0121822 | WO0123401 | US6218188 | WO0126459 | WO0129237 | US6225529 | US6225114 | US6232529 | WO0134726 | WO0135725 | WO0135727 | WO0136444 | WO0136597 | WO0136598 | WO0136596 | US6248535 | US6248876 | USRE37287E | US6265640 | US6284948 | WO0164898 | US6288306 | WO0166704 | US6291224 | US6297426 | US6307126 | WO0179516 | US6323392 | US6326351 | WO0200894 | WO0200904 | WO0202776 | US6338961 | US6340593 | EP1173580 | EP1173581 | EP1173582 | US6346403 | WO0215675 | WO0217430 | US6365377 | US6372965 | US6379946 | US6388171 | US6391348 | WO0242424 | US6399330 | US6417428 | US6423886 | WO02057439 | WO02059324 | US6441274 | US6459019 | JP2002281975 | WO02077185 | WO02079403 | US6468523 | WO03000863 | US2003009011 | WO03011015 | WO03013227 | WO03013228 | WO03014327 | WO03018810 | US6531316 | US6531648 | US6538177 | WO03027243 | US6548291 | WO03033651 | US2003079247 | US6563020 | US6566587 | US6573430 | WO03052063 | US2003120054 | US2003135879 | US2003150014 | US2003163838 | US2003166197 | US6620988 | US6624145 | WO03082899 | US2003204870 | US6642030 | US6664445 | US6664446 | US2004034886 | US6706866 | US6713063 | US6713259 | US6713663 | US6717034 | US2004068767 | WO2004031349 | US2004078852 | US2004098764 | US2004128719 | US2004148654 | US6777592 | WO2004074462 | US6787683 | WO2004076638 | US6794560 | US6801104 | US2004197917 | US2004197916 | US6803498 | US2004210965 | US2004210964 | WO2004090143 | US2004216186 | US6812380 | US6825397 | US2004250311 | US6855865 | US6858778 | WO2005021585 | WO2005038032 | US6891085 | US6893826 | US6911577 | US2005160488 | US2005204418 | US6949626 | US6962705 | WO2005107437 | WO2005110068 | WO2005113778 | US6992237 | US7064249 | US7070982 | US7087810 | WO2006083891 | US2006191034 | US7105332 | WO2006119457 | US7145060 | US7179965 | WO2007035650 | US7205453 | US7208474 | US7227056 | US7238781 | WO2007074405 | US7244820 | US7288643 | US7294760 | US7301069 | US2007277263 | US7306946 | US7323556 | US7329736 | US7378499 | US7385107 | US7405074 | US2008234130 | US7449552 | US2008295207 | US7462760 | US7462481 | US7468278 | US7476781 | US2009035765 | US2009044298 | US7491869 | US7491698 | US2009064373 | US7504229 | US7510878 | US2009093366 | US7521235 | US7531723 | US2009144852 | US2009144863 | US7544862 | US2009188008 | WO2009091864 | US2009192117 | US7605304 | US7615686 | US7629504 | US2010005543 | US2010017914 | US2010024067 | US7696412 | US7705216 | US2010197592 | US7772465 | US7790846 | US7803943 | US7803992 | US2010257633 | US2010287669 | US2010298211 | US7847153 | US7858849 | US2011023184 | US2011054007 | US2011061133 | US2011064710 | US7923602 | US2011191904 | WO2011103248 | WO2011103247 | US2011263488 | WO2011133387 | US2011277181 | US8058571 | US8058515 | US8058510 | US2011283420 | US8063269 | US2011301223 | US8084416 | US8084418 | EP2404499 | US8097769 | US2012029750 | US2012066794 | EP2431472 | US2012079623 | US2012079622 | WO2012038893 | US2012110696 | WO2012058266 | WO2012058528 | WO2012055982 | US8173866 | US2012148497 | US2012164205 | US8217223 | US2012198586 | US8236757 | US8237020 | WO2012139004 | US2012272352 | US2012278954 | US8304604 | US8304605 | US2012297501 | US8318900 | US8319019 | US2012304336 | US2012311746 | US2012311745 | US2012317682 | US2012317681 | US8334431 | US8334366 | US2012324606 | US2012324605 | US2012322660 | US8338152 | US8338661 | US2012331590 | US2012331589 | US2013019349 | US2013116170 | US2013117883 | US2013167269 | US2013167268 | US2014007292 | US2014033361 | US2014130205 | US2014274885 | US2014275208 | WO2015023846 | WO2015038734 | WO2015120270 | WO2015120276 | US2015257389 | US2016040184 | WO2016060948 | US19770622019 | US19820622694 | US20070435707 | US20090964509 | US20190622608 | WO2001US06775 | US20010950933 | US20060427692 | WO2006US33867 | US20070657710 | US20070774121 | US20080525318 | US20100683737 | US20100748994 | WO2015US55502 |