|
29.06.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2021 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (sequence listing) |
Search / examination |
199 |
|
16.03.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
171 |
|
20.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
168 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
165 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2020 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2020 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.10.2019 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.11.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
189 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
0 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
174 |