03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
20.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
01.07.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.03.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2022 [2022/16] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
23.07.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
23.07.2021 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
20.07.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.07.2020 |
First examination report |
|
13.07.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
01.11.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
06.09.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
06.09.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] |
31.07.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.04.2019 |
Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.04.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
05.04.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.04.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
15.03.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
08.01.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|