EP3475549 - STRATEGIES FOR RESONANCE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Intelligent Power Limited 30 Pembroke Road Dublin 4 / IE | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRETCH, Dale Arden 42864 Ashbury Drive Novi, Michigan 48375 / US | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstraße 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/18] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17821199.1 | 28.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017US39845 | Priority number, date | US201662355666P | 28.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662355666 P | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005711 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3475549 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F02D17/02, F01L13/00, F02B75/02, F02D41/30, F02D41/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F01L1/46 (EP,US);
F01L13/00 (EP,US);
F02D13/0203 (US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US);
F02D17/02 (US);
F02D41/0002 (US);
F02D41/008 (EP);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D41/3058 (EP,US);
F02D41/38 (US);
F01L1/18 (EP,US);
F01L1/181 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0012 (EP,US);
F02D2041/389 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | F02D17/02, F01L13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Title | German: | STRATEGIEN FÜR RESONANZVERWALTUNG | [2019/18] | English: | STRATEGIES FOR RESONANCE MANAGEMENT | [2019/18] | French: | STRATÉGIES DE GESTION DE RÉSONANCE | [2019/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 10.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 13.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19941692 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0029]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE10148178 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0052] *; | [I]WO2004009983 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,8-15 * page 5, line 22 - page 10, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005131618 (MEGLI THOMAS W [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0053] - [0072] *; | [X]US2005199220 (OGISO MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1-3,9-11 * figures 6-8 * * paragraphs [0072] - [0085] * | International search | [A]US2006030998 (SURNILLA GOPICHANDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-21, 25-35 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0016], [0249]-[0270]; and figures 1A-1B, 20-33. *; | [A]US2006231061 (LEWIS DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-21, 25-35 * See paragraphs [0002]-[0047]; and figures 1-21, 21A, 22-32. *; | [A]US2008154468 (BERGER AL HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-21, 25-35 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0042]; claims 9-25; and figures 1-2, 3A-3F, 4-5, 11-12. *; | [A]WO2013059365 (TULA TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-21, 25-35* See paragraphs [0002]-[0009]; and figures 1-4, 5A-5B, 6, 7A-7B, 8-9. *; | [A]US2015369140 (WAGH NITISH J [US], et al) [A] 1-21, 25-35 * See paragraphs [0001]-[0012]; and figures 1-4. * |