EP3479182 - AFFECTING FUNCTIONS OF A VEHICLE BASED ON FUNCTION-RELATED INFORMATION ABOUT ITS ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motional AD LLC 100 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2020/51] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states nuTonomy Inc. 100 Northern Avenue, Suite 200 Boston, MA 02210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IAGNEMMA, Karl 42 Hillside Terrace Belmont Massachusetts 02478 / US | 02 /
QIN, Baoxing Blk 612 11-320 Clementi West Street 1 Singapore 120612 / SG | 03 /
WOLFF, Eric 100 Memorial Drive Apt 819 Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | 04 /
ROBBEL, Philipp 126 Charles St Apt 6 Cambridge Massachusetts 02141 / US | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17821263.5 | 29.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017US40040 | Priority number, date | US201615200035 | 01.07.2016 Original published format: US201615200035 | US201615200050 | 01.07.2016 Original published format: US201615200050 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005819 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3479182 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05D3/00, G01C21/34, G01C21/36, G05D1/02, B60W30/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
G05D1/0217 (EP);
G01C21/34 (EP);
G01C21/3602 (EP);
B60W2050/0075 (EP);
B60W2556/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | G05D1/00, G05D3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | BEEINFLUSSUNG VON FUNKTIONEN EINES FAHRZEUGS AUF GRUNDLAGE VON FUNKTIONSBEZOGENEN INFORMATIONEN ÜBER SEINE UMGEBUNG | [2019/19] | English: | AFFECTING FUNCTIONS OF A VEHICLE BASED ON FUNCTION-RELATED INFORMATION ABOUT ITS ENVIRONMENT | [2019/19] | French: | MODIFICATION DE FONCTIONS D'UN VÉHICULE SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS SUR SON ENVIRONNEMENT LIÉES AUX FONCTIONS | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 15.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005065711 (DAHLGREN DARWIN [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0033] , [ 0040] , [ 0138] , [ 0139] , [ 0166]; figures 2, 4, 5 *; | [X]US2008027646 (KAWABATA YOSHINORI [JP]) [X] 1-14* paragraphs [0019] , [ 0024] , [ 0029] - [0034]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [XY]US2005065711 (DAHLGREN DARWIN [US], et al) [X] 1-17, 19-22, 25-27, 30 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Claim 17; para [0033], [0035]-[0036], [0039]-[0040], [0042], [0045], [0047], [0066]-[0069], [0107], [0121], [0138]-[0139], [0166], [0200] * [Y] 18, 23-24, 28-29; | [Y]US2010286824 (SOLOMON NEAL [US]) [Y] 18, 23-24, 28-29* , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0037], [0055], [0083], [0095] * | by applicant | US2005065711 | US2008027646 | US2010318263 | US2012083947 | GB2520129 | WO2016045365 |