Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018004210 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615200050 | 01.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10829116 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2018004206 | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615200035 | 01.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109643118B | Global Dossier | 21.03.2023 | B | CN109643118 | 16.04.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017US40040 | 29.06.2017 | US201615200035 | 01.07.2016 | US201615200050 | 01.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3479182 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2019 | A4 | EP3479182 | 08.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017US40040 | 29.06.2017 | US201615200035 | 01.07.2016 | US201615200050 | 01.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018005819 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615200035 | 01.07.2016 | US201615200050 | 01.07.2016 |