EP3478364 - DIAGNOSTIC OR PREDICTOR OF RELAPSING REMITTING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dignity Health 3033 N. Third Avenue Phoenix, Arizona 85013 / US | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROY, Dolly 3033 N. Third Avenue Phoenix Arizona 85013 / US | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 5 Stirling House Stirling Road The Surrey Research Park Guildford GU2 7RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Hutter, Anton Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17821415.1 | 30.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017US40445 | Priority number, date | US201662357787P | 01.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662357787 P | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018006051 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478364 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/573, A61K31/727, A61P25/00, A61P25/28, G01N33/48, G01N33/53, G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | [2019/43] | CPC: |
A61P25/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/727 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/19] | A61P25/00, A61P25/28, G01N33/48, G01N33/53, G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSEMITTEL ODER VORLÄUFER VON SCHUBFÖRMIG WIEDERKEHRENDER MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | [2019/19] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC OR PREDICTOR OF RELAPSING REMITTING MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | [2019/19] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC OU PRÉDICTEUR DE SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES RÉCURRENTE-RÉMITTENTE | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 10.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 10.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02060471 (ICH PRODUCTIONS LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 28* entire document *; | [Y]US2010081160 (DOTAN NIR [IL], et al) [Y] 5 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2010136232 (FUNDACIO INST DE RECERCA DE L HOSPITAL UNI VALL D HEBRON [ES], et al) [Y] 4 * entire document *; | [Y]US2012071339 (BAHN SABINE [GB], et al) [Y] 3, 6-8 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2014018932 (BUNT ANTONIUS MARTINUS GUSTAVE [US]) [Y] 22, 25, 29 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014308680 (VAN LIESHOUT RON MARTINUS LAURENTIUS [NL]) [Y] 2 * entire document *; | [XY]US2015031562 (KANTOR AARON B [US], et al) [X] 1 * entire document * [Y] 2-5, 19-25, 28-30; | [Y]US2015037327 (KELLER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 6-8 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2015063604 (IMBERTI LUISA [IT], et al) [Y] 19-25, 28-30 * entire document * |