EP3563116 - PATH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/45] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELSCH, Wolfgang Burgstr. 49 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
KLEINKNECHT, Michael Steinackerstr. 8/1 74251 Lehrensteinsfeld / DE | 03 /
KIMMERLE, Mathias Gartenstr. 21 71711 Steinheim / DE | 04 /
FELLA, Sina Rotfelsengasse 10 74243 Langenbrettach / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17821946.5 | 28.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017EP84685 | Priority number, date | DE201610226301 | 29.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016226301 | DE201710222676 | 13.12.2017 Original published format: DE102017222676 | [2019/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018122286 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3563116 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3563116 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
H02K15/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEGSENSOR | [2019/45] | English: | PATH SENSOR | [2019/45] | French: | CAPTEUR DE DISTANCE | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 29.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | ES | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | IT | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 29.03.2023 | |
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 29.03.2023 | |
ES | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 29.03.2023 | |
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE4311955 (INST MIKROSTRUKTURTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13 * Zusammenfassung, Beschr. Sp. 2 / Z. 15-51, Figs. 1, 2 * [I] 3,7,10,11; | [XI]DE19910636 (INST MIKROSTRUKTURTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13 * Zusammenfassung, Beschr. Sp. 9 / Z. 42-68, Sp. 10 / Z. 1-4, Fig. 12 * [I] 3,7,10,11; | [A]EP1595114 (BEI SENSORS & SYS CO INC [US]) [A] 1-13* Zusammenfassung, Beschr. [0017]-[0019], Figs. 4, 5 *; | [XI]DE102006057362 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12,13 * Zusammenfassung, Beschr. [0046]-[0048], Figs. 3, 4 * [I] 3,7,10,11 | Examination | DE10231980 | US2009174396 | GB2506698 | DE112013006754T |