EP3713906 - PROCESS FOR MAKING XYLENES AND PHENOL FROM COAL DERIVED LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 22 Chaoyangmen North Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100728 / CN | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Lubo 21911 W Tori Lane Deer Park Illinois 60010 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Shuguang 111 Westmoreland Dr. Wilmette Illinois 60091 / US | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 17822084.4 | 21.11.2017 | [2020/40] | WO2017US62827 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019103726 | Date: | 31.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3713906 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3713906 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C07C37/70, C07C7/00, C07C7/12, C07C37/50, C07C7/04, B01J19/00, C10G21/16, C07C37/74, C07C6/12, C07C7/14, C07C15/08, C07C39/07, C07C39/04 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C07C37/74 (EP,RU);
C07C6/126 (US);
C07C15/08 (US);
C07C37/48 (RU,US);
C07C37/50 (EP);
C07C37/70 (EP);
C07C39/04 (US);
C07C6/12 (EP,RU);
C07C7/00 (EP);
C07C7/04 (EP,RU);
C07C7/12 (EP);
C07C7/14 (EP);
C10G21/16 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/50, C07C39/04 (EP);
C07C37/70, C07C39/04 (EP);
C07C37/70, C07C39/07 (EP);
C07C37/74, C07C39/04 (EP);
C07C37/74, C07C39/07 (EP);
C07C6/12, C07C15/08 (EP);
C07C7/00, C07C15/08 (EP);
C07C7/04, C07C15/08 (EP); |
Former IPC [2020/40] | C07C37/70, C07C37/74, C07C6/12, C07C7/00, C07C7/04, C07C7/12, C07C7/14, C07C39/07, C07C39/04, C07C15/08, B01J19/00, C10G21/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON XYLENEN UND PHENOL AUS VON KOHLE STAMMENDEN FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2020/40] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING XYLENES AND PHENOL FROM COAL DERIVED LIQUIDS | [2020/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE XYLÈNES ET DE PHÉNOL À PARTIR DE LIQUIDES DÉRIVÉS DU CHARBON | [2020/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 04.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
PT | 07.08.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2683763 (LIEN ARTHUR P, et al) [X] 11,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB1232027 (COAL TAR RESEARCH) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-22 *; | [X]US4041091 (HENRY MICHEL JACQUES) [X] 11,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2016012103 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]CN106187671 (SHENHUA GROUP CORP LTD, et al) [X] 11,12* figure 1 * |