Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11066997 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2021 | B2 | US2019390602 | 26.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7175895B | Global Dossier | 21.11.2022 | B2 | JP2020502413 | 23.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110073081B | Global Dossier | 28.06.2022 | B | CN110073081 | 30.07.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3046730 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3555428 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2021 | B1 | EP3555428 | 23.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112019012198 | 31.10.2023 | B1 | BR112019012198 | 12.11.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2747706 | 13.05.2021 | C2 | RU2019118327 | 02.04.2021 | A3 | RU2019118327 | 18.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2017FR53536 | 13.12.2017 | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018109374 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR3060057 | 30.08.2019 | B1 | FR3060057 | 15.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1662441 | 14.12.2016 |