EP3548930 - METHOD FOR IMPROVING SEISMIC ACQUISITIONS UTILISING ACTIVE ULTRALIGHT SEISMIC DETECTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpotLight 72 avenue de Choisy 75013 Paris / FR | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-KHATIB, Habib 72 Avenue de Choisy 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
MORGAN, Elodie 72 Avenue de Choisy 75013 Paris / FR | [2019/41] | Representative(s) | Argyma 14 Boulevard de Strasbourg 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2019/41] | Argyma 36, rue d'Alsace Lorraine 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 17822555.3 | 28.11.2017 | [2019/41] | WO2017EP80582 | Priority number, date | FR20160061842 | 02.12.2016 Original published format: FR 1661842 | FR20170057024 | 25.07.2017 Original published format: FR 1757024 | [2019/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018099880 | Date: | 07.06.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3548930 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/00, G01V1/30, G01V1/38 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G01V1/003 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/3808 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/282 (RU,US);
G01V1/308 (EP,RU,US);
G01V1/3817 (RU,US);
G01V2210/612 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG VON SEISMISCHEN AUFNAHMEN MITHILFE VON AKTIVEN ULTRALEICHTEN SYSTEMEN ZUR SEISMISCHEN DETEKTION | [2019/41] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPROVING SEISMIC ACQUISITIONS UTILISING ACTIVE ULTRALIGHT SEISMIC DETECTION SYSTEMS | [2019/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DES ACQUISITIONS SISMIQUES METTANT EN OEUVRE DES SYSTÈMES ACTIFS ULTRALÉGERS DE DÉTECTION SISMIQUE | [2019/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/41] | 26.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the invitation to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability not received in time | 22.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file a copy of earlier search results or a statement of non-availability | 30.06.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4188610 (NELSON DAVID E [US]) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]US2009052280 (HERRMANN PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]US2010080081 (MORGAN THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 8,10 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] *; | [XY]US2011273959 (JIN SHENGWEN [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * figure 9 * [Y] 2-8,10; | [Y]CN102944897 (CHENGDU JINGSHI PETROLEUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US2016161620 (HOEBER HENNING [GB], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0052] *; | [Y]US2016162613 (SHEVCHENKO ALEKSEI [RU], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * |