|
25.03.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
26.09.2022 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2022 |
Notification of termination of representative's authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2022 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2022 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
02.06.2022 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.08.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
Change to the inventor details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2019 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
10.01.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
13.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
21 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |