30.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
22.03.2024 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
02.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] |
19.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] |
15.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.01.2024 [2024/03] |
01.12.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
17.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
14.04.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.05.2023 [2023/20] |
04.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.04.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.02.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
16.09.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
16.09.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
13.09.2022 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.08.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
01.06.2022 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.11.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.08.2020 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
21.02.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
04.02.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2019 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
20.09.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
20.09.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.09.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
18.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|