Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11120643 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2021 | B2 | US2020098200 | 26.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 | WO2017EP82499 | 13.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110088815B | Global Dossier | 07.06.2022 | B | CN110088815 | 02.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 | WO2017EP82499 | 13.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3555874 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2023 | B1 | EP3555874 | 23.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 | WO2017EP82499 | 13.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2731188 | 31.08.2020 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 | WO2017EP82499 | 13.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018114492 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016225437 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016225437 | 19.12.2016 |