EP3482095 - JOINT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Impulse Downhole Solutions Ltd. 5120-67 Avenue N.W. Edmonton, Alberta T6B 3N9 / CA | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENSON, Troy 10155-102 Street Suite 2700 Edmonton, Alberta T5J 4G8 / CA | 02 /
LEROUX, Kevin 10155-102 Street Suite 2700 Edmonton, Alberta T5J 4G8 / CA | 03 /
PARENTEAU, Dwayne 10155-102 Street Suite 2700 Edmonton, Alberta T5J 4G8 / CA | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17823383.9 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017CA50829 | Priority number, date | US201662359673P | 07.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662359673 P | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018006179 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482095 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/221, F16C11/06, F16C11/08 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
F16D3/20 (EP,US);
F16D3/185 (US);
F16D3/18 (EP,US);
F16D3/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | F16C11/06, F16C11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG | [2019/20] | English: | JOINT ASSEMBLY | [2019/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE JOINT | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 10.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1300541 (WOLFFGRAM LUDWIG [US]); | [A]GB149504 (JAMES HOYLE SMITH, et al); | [X]GB1170411 (P R MOTORS LTD); | [A]DE2926436 (INGERSOLL RAND CO) | International search | [A]GB967087 (ENG PRODUCTIONS CLEVEDON LTD)[A] 1-4; | [A]US2007274770 (SAGISAKA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4; | [A]US2010247232 (LIN HSIU-NIEN [TW]) [A] 1-4 | by applicant | GB1170411 | WO2014151518 |