EP3481478 - RESPIRATORY INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher&Paykel Healthcare Limited 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland 2013 / NZ | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOCKING, Jake Baker 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | 02 /
MCLAREN, Mark Arvind 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | 03 /
SPEAR, Tony William 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | 04 /
BORNHOLDT, Melissa Catherine 15 Maurice Paykel Place East Tamaki Auckland / NZ | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Harding, Andrew Philip Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17823742.6 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017IB54060 | Priority number, date | US201662358731P | 06.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662358731 P | US201662412399P | 25.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662412399 P | US201662438207P | 22.12.2016 Original published format: US 201662438207 P | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007966 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481478 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/06 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
A61M16/0816 (EP,US);
A61M16/0493 (EP,US);
A61M16/0611 (EP,US);
A61M16/0616 (EP,US);
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/0683 (EP,US);
A61M16/0875 (EP,US);
A61M16/0825 (US);
A61M2205/0272 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | RESPIRATORISCHE SCHNITTSTELLE | [2019/20] | English: | RESPIRATORY INTERFACE | [2019/20] | French: | INTERFACE RESPIRATOIRE | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 27.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7793987 (BUSCH LANCE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 5 ** column 5, line 43 - column 9, line 34 *; | [XI]WO2014045245 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,13 * pages 3-10; figures 1-5b * [I] 6,8,9,12,14,15; | [XI]US2015335846 (ROMAGNOLI JOSE IGNACIO [AU], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] , [0139] - [0144] - [0194] - [0198] - [0204]; figures 1-47 * [I] 6,9,12 | International search | [A]US2005155604 (GING ANTHONY M [CA], et al) [A] 1-22 and 47-57; | [A]US7793987 (BUSCH LANCE [US], et al)[A] 1-22 and 47-57; | [XY]WO2011059346 (SALMON ANDREW PAUL MAXWELL [NZ], et al) [X] 18 * Figures 46 - 49; Pages 40 - 41 Page 41 * [Y] 6 and 15-16; | [A]WO2014110622 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [A] 1-22 and 47-57; | [XY]US2015250972 (HAIBACH RICHARD THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 7-8, 10-14, 17, 19 -22, 47, and 49 57 * Figure 1, 3D; Paragraphs [0017], [0035], [0036], [0041], [0044] - [0047] and [0052] (Figure 1; Paragraphs [0035], [0036], [0047]) * [Y] 6 and 15-16; | [XY]US2015335846 (ROMAGNOLI JOSE IGNACIO [AU], et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 7-14, 17, 19-20, 22,and 47-57 * Figure 11b, 24a, 25a, 25b, 30; Paragraph [0036], [0047], [0141], [0143], [0194], [0195], [0200] and [0275] (Figure 24a; Paragraph [0194], [0036], [0047]). * [Y] 6 and 15-16 | by applicant | US7793987 | WO2012140514 | WO2014045245 | WO2014175752 | US2015335846 |