EP3480240 - WHOLLY AROMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYESTER RESIN, MOLDED ARTICLE, AND ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENEOS Corporation 1-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states JXTG Nippon Oil & Energy Corporation 1-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008162 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASHINO Gosuke c/o JXTG Nippon Oil&Energy Corporation 1-2 Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8162 / JP | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17824215.2 | 03.07.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017JP24405 | Priority number, date | JP20160132826 | 04.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016132826 | JP20160204652 | 18.10.2016 Original published format: JP 2016204652 | JP20170063452 | 28.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017063452 | [2019/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018008612 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3480240 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/60, H01B3/42, H01B17/56 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
H01B3/421 (EP,US);
C08G63/605 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/60 (US);
C08J5/18 (KR);
C08L67/03 (KR);
H01B17/56 (EP,US);
H01B3/42 (EP,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29K2067/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | VOLLAROMATISCHES FLÜSSIGKRISTALLINES POLYESTERHARZ, GEFORMTER GEGENSTAND UND ELEKTRISCHE/ELEKTRONISCHE KOMPONENTE | [2019/19] | English: | WHOLLY AROMATIC LIQUID CRYSTAL POLYESTER RESIN, MOLDED ARTICLE, AND ELECTRICAL/ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2019/19] | French: | RÉSINE DE POLYESTER À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES ENTIÈREMENT AROMATIQUE, ARTICLE MOULÉ ET COMPOSANTE ÉLECTRIQUE/ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2019 | Translation filed | 30.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 11.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH08509020 (E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co.) [A] 1-19* , fig. 1, 2 & WO 1994/026802 A1 fig. 1, 2 & US 5525700 A *; | [XY]JP2009127024 (POLYPLASTICS CO) [X] 1-19 * , claims 1, 2, 10 to 12; paragraph [0044]; table 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17; | [XY]KR20130012509 (SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15, 18, 19 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0002], [0037], [0064] to [0066], [0072], [0076] (Family: none) * [Y] 16, 17 |