EP3483297 - HOT FORMING MEMBER HAVING EXCELLENT CRACK PROPAGATION RESISTANCE AND DUCTILITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Jin-Keun c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Seong-Woo c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Yeol-Rae c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | 04 /
BAK, Won-Mo c/o Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 20-26 Pokposarang-gil Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 57807 / KR | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17824596.5 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017KR07328 | Priority number, date | KR20160086248 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: KR 20160086248 | [2019/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018009041 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3483297 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3483297 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/04, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C23C2/06, C23C2/40, C22C38/00, C21D8/02, B32B15/01, C21D9/46, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, B21D22/02, C23C2/28, // B21D53/88 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B21B3/02 (CN,KR,US);
B21B37/74 (CN,KR,US);
B21D22/022 (EP);
B32B15/013 (EP);
C21D1/26 (CN);
C21D8/0205 (EP);
C21D8/0236 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C21D8/0247 (CN);
C21D9/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/00 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP,CN,KR);
C22C38/08 (EP,CN);
C22C38/12 (EP,CN);
C22C38/14 (EP,CN);
C22C38/16 (EP,CN);
C22C38/18 (EP,CN);
C22C38/20 (US);
C22C38/34 (US);
C22C38/48 (US);
C23C2/06 (EP,CN,KR);
C23C2/29 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/40 (EP,CN,KR);
B21B2201/02 (KR,US);
B21D53/88 (EP);
C21D2211/001 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/24] | C22C38/04, B21B3/02, B21B37/74, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C23C2/06, C23C2/40, C22C38/00, C21D8/02, B32B15/01, C21D9/46, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, B21D22/02, C23C2/28, // B21D53/88 | ||
Former IPC [2019/20] | C22C38/04, B21B3/02, B21B37/74, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C23C2/06, C23C2/40, C22C38/00, C21D8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEISSFORMUNGSELEMENT MIT HERVORRAGENDER RISSAUSBREITUNGSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND FORMBARKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/20] | English: | HOT FORMING MEMBER HAVING EXCELLENT CRACK PROPAGATION RESISTANCE AND DUCTILITY, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2019/20] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE FORMAGE À CHAUD PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE À LA PROPAGATION DES FISSURES ET UNE DUCTILITÉ EXCELLENTES, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2019 | Translation filed | 31.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 05.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2017 | AL | 27.04.2022 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | HR | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | MK | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | RS | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | SM | 27.04.2022 | IE | 07.07.2022 | LU | 07.07.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | GB | 27.07.2022 | NO | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 07.07.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.07.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GB | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 07.07.2017 | |
AL | 27.04.2022 | ||
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.07.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GB | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 07.07.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GB | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GB | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 07.07.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 27.04.2022 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
SM | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RS | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
HR | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
NO | 27.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2946848 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0073] * [A] 1-9; | [A]WO2015182591 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [XYI]WO2016063467 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * [Y] 10 [I] 8; | [P]EP3150736 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) [P] * abstract *; | [P]EP3181715 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0099] * * example O; tables 1-1 * * example O1; tables 2-1 * * example 19; tables 3-1 *; | [T] - Nina Fonstein, "Candidates for the Third Generation: Medium Mn Steels", Advanced High Strength Sheet Steels, Cham, Springer International Publishing, (20151231), pages 297 - 325, doi:10.1007/978-3-319-19165-2_9, ISBN 978-3-319-19165-2, XP055584113 [T] * Section 9.2.2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-19165-2_9 | International search | [A]JP2010065293 (JFE STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0037]-[0042] and claims 1-4, 13. *; | [A]KR20120073407 (POSCO [KR]) [A] 1-10 * See paragraph [0059] and claims 1-5. *; | [A]JP2014019941 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) [A] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0030], [0041] and claims 1, 2, 6. *; | [XY]JP2014156653 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1-5,9,10 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0052], [0088], [0096], [0102]-[0104] and claims 1, 6-9. * [Y] 6-8; | [Y]WO2016063467 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-8 * See paragraphs [0064], [0065], [0069] and claim 1. * | Examination | - CHRISTIEN F ET AL, "A comparison of dilatometry and in-situ neutron diffraction in tracking bulk phase transformations in a martensitic stainless steel", MATERIALS CHARACTERIZATION, ELSEVIER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20130516), vol. 82, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHAR.2013.05.002, ISSN 1044-5803, pages 50 - 57, XP028576370 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchar.2013.05.002 | by applicant | US6296805 | KR20140035033 |