EP3482469 - GRATING BASED OPTICAL TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forelux Inc. 5F-2, No. 6 Taiyuan 1st Street Zhubei City, Hshinchu County 302 / TW | For all designated states Chen, Shu-Lu 1000 Foster City Boulevard Apt. 4303 San Mateo, California 94404 / US | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Shu-Lu 1000 Foster City Blvd. Apt. 4303 San Mateo, California 94404 / US | 02 /
NA, Yun-Chung No. 101 Sec. 2 Guangfu Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | Conroy, John Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17824804.3 | 05.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017US40712 | Priority number, date | US201615201907 | 05.07.2016 Original published format: US201615201907 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018009538 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482469 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/187, H01S5/10, G02B6/12, // H01S5/042, H01S5/062, H01S5/125, H01S5/14, H01S5/12 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
H01S5/1032 (EP,US);
H01S5/187 (EP);
H01S5/0424 (EP);
H01S5/04256 (EP,US);
H01S5/04257 (EP,US);
H01S5/06203 (EP);
H01S5/1014 (EP);
H01S5/1082 (EP);
H01S5/124 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | H01S5/026 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | GITTERBASIERTER OPTISCHER SENDER | [2019/20] | English: | GRATING BASED OPTICAL TRANSMITTER | [2019/20] | French: | ÉMETTEUR OPTIQUE À RÉSEAU DE DIFFRACTION | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 13.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/45] | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.2021 | 31.07.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2022 | 31.07.2023 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2913902 (FORELUX INC [TW]) [Y] 1-15* paragraphs [0013] - [0109]; figures 1-12 *; | [XYI] - DAN BOTEZ ET AL, "Analysis of surface-emitting second-order distributed feedback lasers with central grating phaseshift", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030901), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JSTQE.2003.819467, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 1153 - 1165, XP011106603 [X] 1-7,9,11 * page 1154, column l, paragraph 3 - page 1163, column l, paragraph 4; figures 1-7,12-14 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTQE.2003.819467 | International search | [XY]US2014348195 (SAKAGUCHI TAKUI [JP], et al) [X] 1, 2, 8-17, 27, 28 * , paragraphs 0237-0265, 0276-0285, 0289-0291, 0348, 0466-0471, FIGs.l-18,33B,65B & JP 2014-197665 A * [Y] 3-7, 18-26, 29-31; | [YA]EP0322180 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 3-7, 18-26, 29-31 * , columnl linelO - column10 line35, FIGs.2-5 & JP 2-77185 A& US 4958357 A& DE 3851874 C & KR 10-1992-0008234 B * [A] 1, 2, 8-17, 27, 28; | [YA]JPS63318185 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 3-7, 29, 30 * , page2 left-lower column linel - page3 right-upper column line11, FIGs.1-7 (Family: none) * [A] 1, 2, 8-28, 31; | [YA]JPS63111689 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 5-7 * 1988.05.16, page2 right-lower column linel6 - page3 right-lower column line7, FIGs. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 1-4, 8-31; | [YA]US5970081 (HIRAYAMA YUZO [JP], et al) [Y] 5-7 * , column5 line50 - column 17 line59, FIGs. 1-25 & JP 10-150242 A * [A] 1-4, 8-31; | [YA]US4894833 (CARLIN DONALD B [US]) [Y] 5-7 * , column2 line1 - column4 line42, FIGs. 1-4 & JP 2-119196 A& GB 2221791 A& DE 3926053 A& FR 2635418 A& CA 1318722 A& IT 8921463 DO * [A] 1-4, 8-31; | [YA]US6775427 (EVANS GARY A [US]) [Y] 5-7 * , column5 line12 - column12 line33, FIGs. 1-7 (Family: none) * [A] 1-4, 8-31; | [YA]US2006093299 (OGAWA KENSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 18-26, 31 * , paragraphs 0061-0126, FIGs. 1,4 & JP 6-46347 A1 & WO 2006/046347 A1 & EP 1832904 A1 * [A] 1-17, 27-30; | [YA]US2006051016 (OGAWA KENSUKE [JP], et al) [Y] 18-26, 31 * , paragraphs 0112-0121, FIG.9 & JP 4-63797 A1 & WO 2004/063797 A1 & EP 1584969 A1 & CN 1717612 A * [A] 1-17, 27-30; | [A]WO2015008627 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1-31 * , whole document & US 2016/0380405 A1 & DE 112014003317 T5 *; | [A]US2009074024 (NODA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-31 * , whole document & JP 2009-76900 A *; | [A]JP2011112942 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1-31 * , whole document (Family: none) *; | [A]US2005238079 (BOTEZ DAN [US]) [A] 1-31 * , whole document & US 2005/0031002 A1 & WO 2003/063305 A2 & EP 1472763 A2 & CA2473396 A & AU 2003207591 A * |