EP3482344 - PORTABLE PERSONALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, Rashmi 3360 Pine Court West Bloomfield, Michigan 48324 / US | 02 /
VANGOETHEM, Timothy Raymond 3182 Beach Lake Drive W Milford, Michigan 48380 / US | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2022/35] |
Former [2019/20] | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17825049.4 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017US41244 | Priority number, date | US201662359629P | 07.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662359629 P | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018009897 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482344 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3482344 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, B60R25/25, B60R1/00 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B60R16/037 (EP,US);
B60W50/085 (US);
B60R1/28 (EP,US);
B60W40/09 (US);
G06F21/32 (US);
G06V40/19 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | G06K9/00, G06K9/78, B60R25/25, G06K9/46, B60R1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/20] | G06K9/00, G06K9/78, B60R25/25, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERUNG TRAGBARER GERÄTE | [2019/20] | English: | PORTABLE PERSONALIZATION | [2019/20] | French: | PERSONNALISATION PORTABLE | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 18.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Request for further processing for: | 14.07.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/14] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO02073535 (RICONDA JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraphs 5,6 * [I] 2,3,5-7,12,15; | [A]US2012121185 (ZAVESKY ERIC [US]) [A] 3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] *; | [A]WO2014113349 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 8,9 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0028] *; | [A]EP2784763 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0085] , [0086] *; | [XAI]WO2014206406 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [X] 1,14 * abstract * * page 15, paragraph 2 * [A] 4,5 [I] 2,3,6-8,12,15; | [E]WO2018145130 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [E] 1,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0060] , [0067] , [0068] * | International search | [A]US2013204457 (KING ANTHONY GERALD [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document. *; | [Y]US2013271370 (WANG KONGQIAO [FI], et al) [Y] 3, 16 * , para [0020], [0030]-[0035]. *; | [Y]US2014136013 (WOLVERTON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [Y] 9, 12 * , para [0025]-[0028. *; | [Y]US2014371984 (FUNG KIN C [US], et al) [Y] 10, 19 * , para [0126], [0131], [0133]. *; | [XYA]US2015053066 (HAMPIHOLI VALLABHA VASANT [IN], et al) [X] 1-2, 6, 15 * , para [0005], [0017]-[0018], [0025]-[0028], [0030], [0032], [0055], 0065], [0066], [0084]. * [Y] 3, 8-10, 12-14, 16,18-20 [A] 4-5, 7, 11, 17; | [Y]US2015123818 (SELLSCHOPP STEFAN [DE]) [Y] 8, 9 * , para [0046]. *; | [A]US2015284008 (TAN HONGHAO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document. *; | [Y]US2015353039 (GRAHAM PHILIP R [US]) [Y] 13-14 * , para [0026], [0029]. *; | [Y]US2016109701 (GOLDMAN-SHENHAR CLAUDIA V [IL], et al) [Y] 18-20 * , para [0025], [0028]-[0029], [0039], [0041]-[0044], [0047], [0049]-[0051], [0056]-[0057], [0076][0078], [0082], [0092]. * | by applicant | US2015053066 |