EP3692690 - DIFFERENTIATED ABATEMENT OF CHARGING REQUESTS IN CASE OF OVERLOAD AT ONLINE CHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÖRNKVIST, Robert Bryggaregatan 16 374 38 Karlshamn / SE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 17825237.5 | 22.12.2017 | [2020/33] | WO2017EP84397 | Priority number, date | US201762569052P | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762569052 P | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068360 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692690 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/801, H04L12/825 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H04L47/263 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/64 (EP,US);
H04M15/8027 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERTE BESEITIGUNG VON LADEANFORDERUNGEN BEI ÜBERLAST IN EINEM ONLINE-LADESYSTEM | [2020/33] | English: | DIFFERENTIATED ABATEMENT OF CHARGING REQUESTS IN CASE OF OVERLOAD AT ONLINE CHARGING SYSTEM | [2020/33] | French: | RÉDUCTION DIFFÉRENCIÉE DE DEMANDES DE FACTURATION EN CAS DE SURCHARGE AU NIVEAU D'UN SYSTÈME DE FACTURATION EN LIGNE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/12] | 16.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011040845 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al) [I] 1-34 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-8 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0046] *; | [I]US2013275583 (ROACH ADAM BOYD [US], et al) [I] 1-34 * abstract * * column 17 - paragraph 34; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [48;78] *; | [A]US2014108212 (CASSEL JOEL [SE]) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [A]WO2017092819 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY [FI]) [A] 8,20 * abstract * * page 14, line 27 - line 33 * |