|
10.05.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
24.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
06.12.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
04.09.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
29 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.01.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |