|
04.05.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.05.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
25.01.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
21.08.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
06.07.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2019 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
11.05.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Disclaimer regarding the provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
09.03.2018 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
6 |