13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
03.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
07.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2023 [2023/19] |
16.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2023 [2023/03] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
06.05.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
18.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
21.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
19.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
22.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
15.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] |
28.05.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.05.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.05.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
24.01.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
20.08.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.02.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
21.02.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
29.01.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.11.2019 |
Change - inventor |
|
20.09.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
20.09.2019 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.09.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
26.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
14.06.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|