Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11013315 | Global Dossier | 25.05.2021 | B2 | US2020205561 | 02.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715843245 | 15.12.2017 | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | US202016814809 | 10.03.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10610008 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2020 | B2 | US2018168332 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715843245 | 15.12.2017 | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102565094B | Global Dossier | 10.08.2023 | B1 | KR20190097139 | 20.08.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7229920B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | JP2020501722 | 23.01.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110267622B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2021 | B | CN110267622 | 20.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3128828 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2023 | C | CA3128828 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | CA3046811 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3046811 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2021 | C | CA3046811 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022203171B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2023 | B2 | AU2022203171 | 02.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017378474 | 15.12.2017 | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | AU2022203171 | 12.05.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017378474B | Global Dossier | 02.06.2022 | B2 | AU2017378474 | 04.07.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3554418 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2021 | B1 | EP3554418 | 23.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 | WO2017US66604 | 15.12.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018112309 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662435053 | 15.12.2016 |