EP3513987 - BINDER AND BINDER MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Okamura Yugen Kaisha Kondo Bldg. 5F. 4-12, Nishitemma 4-chome Kita-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 5300047 / JP | [2019/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAMURA, Toshio 4-12 Yasui-cho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0045 / JP | [2019/30] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17825722.6 | 29.06.2017 | [2019/30] | WO2017JP24021 | Priority number, date | WO2017JP20466 | 01.06.2017 Original published format: PCT/JP2017/020466 | WO2017JP21487 | 09.06.2017 Original published format: PCT/JP2017/021487 | [2019/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018220864 | Date: | 06.12.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3513987 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.12.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B42F9/00 | [2019/30] | CPC: |
B42F9/00 (EP);
B42F9/002 (US);
B42F9/007 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATEI UND ARCHIVIERUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2019/30] | English: | BINDER AND BINDER MECHANISM | [2019/30] | French: | RELIURE ET MÉCANISME DE RELIURE | [2019/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2018 | Translation filed | 17.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2018 | Examination requested [2019/30] | 06.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005056306 (OKAMURA YUGEN KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US3684390 (STECKLOW JAMES P) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 51; figure - *; | [A]WO2006131982 (OKAMURA YUGEN KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007125721 (OKAMURA KK) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US5320456 (WITH JERE L [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 20; figures 5,7,10 *; | [A]JP3144270U (OKAMURA YG.) [A] 1-15 * figure . *; | [A]JP3753918B (OKAMURA KK) [A] 1-15 * figure - * | International search | [A]WO2005056306 (OKAMURA YUGEN KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 5-56306 A1 & AU 2003289045 A *; | [A]JPH01272493 (TATSUMI SHIGEZO) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS4014330Y (Sekisei Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6150480U (Mitsuhiro Shoji Kabushiki Kaisha) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS6183978U (Mitsuhiro Shoji Kabushiki Kaisha) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2012027503 (CHILES ROSS [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |