EP3562701 - LOW-VOLT DECOUPLING FROM A MODULAR ENERGY STORE CONVERTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität der Bundeswehr München Werner-Heisenberg-Weg 39 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2019/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELLING, Florian Walchenseeplatz 10 81539 München / DE | 02 /
WEYH, Thomas Hanebergstraße 22 80637 München / DE | 03 /
SINGER, Arthur Ludwig-Richter-Straße 21 80687 München / DE | [2019/45] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2019/45] | Application number, filing date | 17825847.1 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/45] | WO2017EP84086 | Priority number, date | DE201610125720 | 27.12.2016 Original published format: DE102016125720 | [2019/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018122094 | Date: | 05.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3562701 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60L1/00, B60L11/18, H02M7/483, H02M3/335, B60R16/033 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H02M7/483 (EP,US);
B60L1/00 (EP,US);
B60L58/18 (EP);
B60L58/19 (EP);
B60L58/22 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (US);
H02M3/33569 (US);
H02M3/33584 (EP);
H02M7/4835 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/45] | Title | German: | NIEDERVOLTAUSKOPPLUNG AUS EINEM MODULAREN ENERGIESPEICHER-UMRICHTERSYSTEM | [2019/45] | English: | LOW-VOLT DECOUPLING FROM A MODULAR ENERGY STORE CONVERTER SYSTEM | [2019/45] | French: | DÉCOUPLAGE BASSE TENSION COMPOSÉ D'UN SYSTÈME MODULAIRE ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE-ONDULEUR | [2019/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/45] | 05.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012038031 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP2933906 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [AD]DE102014110410 (UNIVERSITÄT DER BUNDESWEHR MÜNCHEN [DE]); | [A]DE102014216470 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]WO2016152989 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [L]EP3276815 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | by applicant | DE10103031 | DE102014110410 |