EP3551211 - LEBECETIN, A C-TYPE LECTIN, AS NEOVASCULARIZATION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorbonne Université 21, rue de L'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR DE TUNIS 13 place Pasteur B.P. 74 1002 Tunis / TN | [2019/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILLONNEAU, Xavier 65 rue du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | 02 /
MONTASSAR, Fadoua 3 rue Gazan 75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
MARRAKCHI, Naziha 15 rue Salem Bouhajeb El Menzah 8 Ariana 2037 / TN | 04 /
MESSADI, Erij 9 rue Mohamed Bourguiba Mutuelleville Tunis 1002 / TN | 05 /
SENNLAUB, Florian 117 Boulevard Voltaire 75011 Paris / FR | 06 /
SAHEL, José-Alain 4, rue Dieulafoy 75013 Paris / FR | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 17826163.2 | 12.12.2017 | [2019/42] | WO2017EP82482 | Priority number, date | EP20160306661 | 12.12.2016 Original published format: EP 16306661 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018108945 | Date: | 21.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3551211 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3551211 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C07K14/46, C12N15/11, A61P27/02, A61P35/00 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
A61K38/1703 (EP,IL,US);
A61P27/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/4726 (KR);
A61K38/1866 (US);
A61K45/06 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/46 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/7056 (EP,IL,US);
C12N15/86 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEBECETIN, EIN C-TYP-LEKTIN, ALS NEOVASKULARISATIONSINHIBITOR | [2019/42] | English: | LEBECETIN, A C-TYPE LECTIN, AS NEOVASCULARIZATION INHIBITOR | [2019/42] | French: | LEBECÉTINE, LECTINE DE TYPE C, COMME INHIBITEUR DE NÉOVASCULARISATION | [2021/14] |
Former [2019/42] | LEBECETINE, LECTINE DE TYPE C, EN TANT QU'INHIBITEUR DE NÉOVASCULARISATION | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 04.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.03.2020 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 15.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Request for further processing for: | 15.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2017 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | LU | 12.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.12.2017 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
LU | 12.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012154894 (ALLEGRO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * the whole document ** claims 1, 23-31 *; | [XP] - FADOUA MONTASSAR ET AL, "Lebecetin, a C-type lectin, inhibits choroidal and retinal neovascularization", THE FASEB JOURNAL, US, (20161214), vol. 31, no. 3, doi:10.1096/fj.201600351R, ISSN 0892-6638, pages 1107 - 1119, XP055359263 [XP] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.201600351R | [XP] - CATHERINE EGAN ET AL, "The United Kingdom Diabetic Retinopathy Electronic Medical Record Users Group, Report 1: baseline characteristics and visual acuity outcomes in eyes treated with intravitreal injections of ranibizumab for diabetic macular oedema", BRITISH JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, GB, (20161213), vol. 101, no. 1, doi:10.1136/bjophthalmol-2016-309313, ISSN 0007-1161, pages 75 - 80, XP055359268 [XP] 1-20 * Lebecetin, a C-type lectin, inhibits choroidal and retinal neovascularization; page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/bjophthalmol-2016-309313 | [Y] - SARRAY ET AL, "Lebectin and lebecetin, two C-type lectins from snake venom, inhibit alpha5beta1 and alphav-containing integrins", MATRIX BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NL, (20070501), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.MATBIO.2007.01.001, ISSN 0945-053X, pages 306 - 313, XP022054746 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matbio.2007.01.001 | [Y] - ANTHONY PILORGET ET AL, "Lebectin, aMacrovipera lebetina venom-derived C-type lectin, inhibits angiogenesis both in vitro and in vivo", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, US, (20070101), vol. 211, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jcp.20935, ISSN 0021-9541, pages 307 - 315, XP055359264 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.20935 | [Y] - JED JEBALI ET AL, "Expression of a functional recombinant C-type lectin-like protein lebecetin in the human embryonic kidney cells", BIOTECHNOLOGY PROGRESS., US, (20121019), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:10.1002/btpr.1632, ISSN 8756-7938, pages 1560 - 1565, XP055359275 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.1632 | [Y] - JEBALI JED ET AL, "Lebecin, a new C-type lectin like protein fromMacrovipera lebetinavenom with anti-tumor activity against the breast cancer cell line MDA-MB231", TOXICON, (2014), vol. 86, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2014.04.010, ISSN 0041-0101, pages 16 - 27, XP028873533 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2014.04.010 | [Y] - JEBALI J ET AL, "C-type lectin protein isoforms of Macrovipera lebetina: cDNA cloning and genetic diversity", TOXICON, ELMSFORD, NY, US, vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.TOXICON.2008.11.006, ISSN 0041-0101, (20090201), pages 228 - 237, (20081124), XP025873945 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2008.11.006 | [Y] - K. BAILEY FREUND ET AL, "Aflibercept: a review of its use in the treatment of choroidal neovascularization due to age-related macular degeneration", CLINICAL OPHTHALMOLOGY, (20151201), doi:10.2147/OPTH.S80040, page 2355, XP055359313 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/OPTH.S80040 | [Y] - MAKOTO ISHIKAWA ET AL, "Future Therapies of Wet Age-Related Macular Degeneration", JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, US, (20150101), vol. 2015, doi:10.1155/2015/138070, ISSN 2090-004X, pages 1 - 10, XP055359615 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * * page 4, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2015/138070 | [Y] - SARRAY S ET AL, "Lebecetin, a potent antiplatelet C-type lectin from Macrovipera lebetina venom", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - PROTEINS & PROTEOMICS, ELSEVIER, NETHERLANDS, (20030923), vol. 1651, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S1570-9639(03)00232-2, ISSN 1570-9639, pages 30 - 40, XP004456089 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1570-9639(03)00232-2 | by applicant | WO0183692 | US2007184015 | - HOWARTH, Cell Biol Toxicol, (20100000), vol. 26, pages 1 - 10 | - DALKARA D et al., Gene Ther., (20120200), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 176 - 81 | - DALKARA D et al., Sci Transl Mes., (20130612), vol. 5, no. 189, page 189ra76 | - BERGER, A.; CAVALLERO, S.; DOMINGUEZ, E.; BARBE, P.; SIMONUTTI, M.; SAHEL, J.-A.; SENNLAUB, F.; RAOUL, W.; PAQUES, M.; BEMELMANS,, "Spectral-Domain Optical Coherence Tomography of the Rodent Eye: Highlighting Layers of the Outer Retina Using Signal Averaging and Comparison with Histology", PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, page e96494 | - BISHOP, P. N., "The role of extracellular matrix in retinal vascular development and preretinal neovascularization", Exp. Eye Res., (20150000), vol. 133, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exer.2014.10.021, pages 30 - 36, XP029209744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2014.10.021 | - BROOKS, P. C.; MONTGOMERY, A. M.; ROSENFELD, M.; REISFELD, R. A.; HU, T.; KLIER, G.; CHERESH, D. A., "Integrin alpha v beta 3 antagonists promote tumor regression by inducing apoptosis of angiogenic blood vessels", Cell, (19940000), vol. 79, pages 1157 - 1164 | - BROWN, D. M.; KAISER, P. K.; MICHELS, M.; SOUBRANE, G.; HEIER, J. S.; KIM, R. Y.; SY, J. P.; SCHNEIDER, S., "ANCHOR Study Group. (2006) Ranibizumab versus verteporfin for neovascular age-related macular degeneration", N. Engl. J. Med., vol. 355, pages 1432 - 1444 | - CONNOR, K. M.; KRAH, N. M.; DENNISON, R. J.; ADERMAN, C. M.; CHEN, J.; GUERIN, K. I.; SAPIEHA, P.; STAHL, A.; WILLETT, K. L.; SMIT, "Quantification of oxygen-induced retinopathy in the mouse: a model of vessel loss, vessel regrowth and pathological angiogenesis", Nat. Protoc., (20090000), vol. 4, pages 1565 - 1573 | - D'AMORE, P. A., "Mechanisms of retinal and choroidal neovascularization", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (19940000), vol. 35, pages 3974 - 3979, XP000574860 | - DOMINGUEZ, E.; RAOUL, W.; CALIPPE, B.; SAHEL, J.-A.; GUILLONNEAU, X.; PAQUES, M.; SENNLAUB, F., "Experimental Branch Retinal Vein Occlusion Induces Upstream Pericyte Loss and Vascular Destabilization", PLoS One, (20150000), vol. 10, page e0132644 | - EGH0J, M. S.; S0RENSEN, T. L., "Tachyphylaxis during treatment of exudative age-related macular degeneration with ranibizumab", Br. J. Ophthalmol., (20120000), vol. 96, pages 21 - 23 | - FOROOGHIAN, F.; CUKRAS, C.; MEYERLE, C. B.; CHEW, E. Y.; WONG, W. T., "Tachyphylaxis Following Intravitreal Bevacizumab for Exudative Age-Related Macular Degeneration", Retina Phila. Pa, (20090000), vol. 29, pages 723 - 731 | - FRIEDLANDER, M.; BROOKS, P. C.; SHAFFER, R. W.; KINCAID, C. M.; VARNER, J. A.; CHERESH, D. A., "Definition of two angiogenic pathways by distinct alpha v integrins", Science, (19950000), vol. 270, pages 1500 - 1502 | - FRIEDLANDER, M.; THEESFELD, C. L.; SUGITA, M.; FRUTTIGER, M.; THOMAS, M. A.; CHANG, S.; CHERESH, D. A., "Involvement of integrins alpha v beta 3 and alpha v beta 5 in ocular neovascular diseases", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A., (19960000), vol. 93, pages 9764 - 9769, XP002656145 | - "Prevalence of age-related macular degeneration in the United States", FRIEDMAN, D. S.; O'COLMAIN, B. J.; MUNOZ, B.; TOMANY, S. C.; MCCARTY, C.; DE JONG, P. T. V. M.; NEMESURE, B.; MITCHELL, P.; KEMPEN, Arch. Ophthalmol. Chic. !!! 1960, Eye Diseases Prevalence Research Group, (20040000), vol. 122, pages 564 - 572 | - FU, Y.; PONCE, M. L.; THILL, M.; YUAN, P.; WANG, N. S.; CSAKY, K. G., "Angiogenesis inhibition and choroidal neovascularization suppression by sustained delivery of an integrin antagonist, EMD478761", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (20070000), vol. 48, pages 5184 - 5190 | - GOODMAN, S. L.; PICARD, M., "Integrins as therapeutic targets", Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (20120000), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tips.2012.04.002, pages 405 - 412, XP028495741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tips.2012.04.002 | - HONDA, S.; NAGAI, T.; NEGI, A., "Anti-angiogenic effects of non-peptide integrin alphavbeta3 specific antagonist on laser-induced choroidal neovascularization in mice", Graefes Arch. Clin. Exp. Ophthalmol. Albrecht Von Graefes Arch. Fur Klin. Exp. Ophthalmol., (20090000), vol. 247, pages 515 - 522, XP019714650 | - JEBALI J; BAZAA A; SARRAY S; BENHAJ K; KARBOUL A; EL AYEB M; MARRAKCHI N; GARGOURI A, "C-type lectin protein isoforms of Macrovipera lebetina: cDNA cloning and genetic diversity", Toxicon., (20090200), vol. 53, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.toxicon.2008.11.006, pages 228 - 37, XP025873945 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2008.11.006 | - JEBALI J.; JEANNEAU C.; MORJEN M.; MATHIEU S.; BAZAA A.; EL AYEB M.; LUIS J.; GARGOURI A.; MARRAKCHI N.; EL BATTARI A., "Expression of a functional recombinant C-type lectin-like protein lebecetin in the human embryonic kidney cells", Biotechnol Prog., (20121100), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/btpr.1632, pages 1560 - 5, XP055359275 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/btpr.1632 | - "The prevalence of diabetic retinopathy among adults in the United States", KEMPEN, J. H.; O'COLMAIN, B. J.; LESKE, M. C.; HAFFNER, S. M.; KLEIN, R.; MOSS, S. E.; TAYLOR, H. R.; HAMMAN, R. F., Arch. Ophthalmol. Chic. !!!, Eye Diseases Prevalence Research Group, (19600000), vol. 122, pages 552 - 563 | - KLEIN, R.; PETO, T.; BIRD, A.; VANNEWKIRK, M. R., "The epidemiology of age-related macular degeneration", Am. J. Ophthalmol., (20040000), vol. 137, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ajo.2003.11.069, pages 486 - 495, XP004755593 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajo.2003.11.069 | - LAMBERT, V.; LECOMTE, J.; HANSEN, S.; BLACHER, S.; GONZALEZ, M.-L. A.; STRUMAN, I.; SOUNNI, N. E.; ROZET, E.; DE TULLIO, P.; FOIDA, "Laser-induced choroidal neovascularization model to study age-related macular degeneration in mice", Nat. Protoc., (20130000), vol. 8, pages 2197 - 2211 | - LAUNAY, P.-S.; REBOUSSIN, E.; LIANG, H.; KESSAL, K.; GODEFROY, D.; ROSTENE, W.; SAHEL, J.-A.; BAUDOUIN, C., "Melik Parsadaniantz, S., and Reaux Le Goazigo, A. (2016) Ocular inflammation induces trigeminal pain, peripheral and central neuroinflammatory mechanisms", Neurobiol. Dis., vol. 88, pages 16 - 28 | - LAVALETTE, S.; RAOUL, W.; HOUSSIER, M.; CAMELO, S.; LEVY, O.; CALIPPE, B.; JONET, L.; BEHAR-COHEN, F.; CHEMTOB, S.; GUILLONNEAU, X, "Interleukin-ip Inhibition Prevents Choroidal Neovascularization and Does Not Exacerbate Photoreceptor Degeneration", Am. J. Pathol., (20110000), vol. 178, pages 2416 - 2423 | - MARTINEZ-ZAPATA, M. J.; MARTF-CARVAJAL, A. J.; SOLA, I.; PIJOAN, J. I.; BUIL-CALVO, J. A.; CORDERO, J. A.; EVANS, J. R., "Anti-vascular endothelial growth factor for proliferative diabetic retinopathy", Cochrane Database Syst. Rev., (20140000), vol. 11 | - NAKAJIMA, T.; HIRATA, M.; SHEARER, T. R.; AZUMA, M., "Mechanism for laser-induced neovascularization in rat choroid: Accumulation of integrin a chain-positive cells and their ligands", Mol. Vis., (20140000), vol. 20, pages 864 - 871 | - PAPADOPOULOS, N.; MARTIN, J.; RUAN, Q.; RAFIQUE, A.; ROSCONI, M. P.; SHI, E.; PYLES, E. A.; YANCOPOULOS, G. D.; STAHL, N.; WIEGAND, "Binding and neutralization of vascular endothelial growth factor (VEGF) and related ligands by VEGF Trap, ranibizumab and bevacizumab", Angiogenesis, (20120000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1007/s10456-011-9249-6, pages 171 - 185, XP035048394 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10456-011-9249-6 | - PILORGET, A.; CONESA, M.; SARRAY, S.; MICHAUD-LEVESQUE, J.; DAOUD, S.; KIM, K. S.; DEMEULE, M.; MARVALDI, J.; EL AYEB, M.; MARRAKC, "Lebectin, a Macrovipera lebetina venom-derived C-type lectin, inhibits angiogenesis both in vitro and in vivo", J. Cell. Physiol., (20070000), vol. 211, doi:doi:10.1002/jcp.20935, pages 307 - 315, XP055359264 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jcp.20935 | - REMTULLA, S.; HALLETT, P. E., "A schematic eye for the mouse, and comparisons with the rat", Vision Res., (19850000), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/0042-6989(85)90076-8, pages 21 - 31, XP024310856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0042-6989(85)90076-8 | - ROBBINS, S. G.; BREM, R. B.; WILSON, D. J.; O'ROURKE, L. M.; ROBERTSON, J. E.; WESTRA, I.; PLANCK, S. R.; ROSENBAUM, J. T., "Immunolocalization of integrins in proliferative retinal membranes", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (19940000), vol. 35, pages 3475 - 3485 | - "Ranibizumab for neovascular age-related macular degeneration", ROSENFELD, P. J.; BROWN, D. M.; HEIER, J. S.; BOYER, D. S.; KAISER, P. K.; CHUNG, C. Y.; KIM, R. Y., N. Engl. J. Med., MARINA Study Group, (20060000), vol. 355, pages 1419 - 1431 | - SALEHI-HAD, H.; ROH, M. I.; GIANI, A.; HISATOMI, T.; NAKAO, S.; KIM, I. K.; GRAGOUDAS, E. S.; VAVVAS, D.; GUCCIONE, S.; MILLER, J., "Utilizing Targeted Gene Therapy with Nanoparticles Binding Alpha v Beta 3 for Imaging and Treating Choroidal Neovascularization", PLoS One, (20110000), vol. 6, page e18864 | - SARRAY, S.; SRAIRI, N.; HATMI, M.; LUIS, J.; LOUZIR, H.; REGAYA, I.; SLEMA, H.; MARVALDI, J.; EL AYEB, M.; MARRAKCHI, N., "Lebecetin, a potent antiplatelet C-type lectin from Macrovipera lebetina venom", Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20030000), vol. 1651, doi:doi:10.1016/S1570-9639(03)00232-2, pages 30 - 40, XP004456089 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1570-9639(03)00232-2 | - SARRAY, S.; DELAMARRE, E.; MARVALDI, J.; EL AYEB, M.; MARRAKCHI, N.; LUIS, J., "Lebectin and lebecetin, two C-type lectins from snake venom, inhibit alpha5betal and alphaV-containing integrins", Matrix Biol. J. Int. Soc. Matrix Biol., (20070000), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1016/j.matbio.2007.01.001, pages 306 - 313, XP022054746 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matbio.2007.01.001 | - SCHINDELIN, J.; ARGANDA-CARRERAS, I.; FRISE, E.; KAYNIG, V.; LONGAIR, M.; PIETZSCH, T.; PREIBISCH, S.; RUEDEN, C.; SAALFELD, S.; S, "Fiji: an open-source platform for biological-image analysis", Nat. Methods, (20120000), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.2019, pages 676 - 682, XP055343835 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2019 | - SHAO, Z.; FRIEDLANDER, M.; HURST, C. G.; CUI, Z.; PEI, D. T.; EVANS, L. P.; JUAN, A. M.; TAHIR, H.; DUHAMEL, F.; CHEN, J., "Choroid Sprouting Assay: An Ex Vivo Model of Microvascular Angiogenesis", PLoS One, (20130000), vol. 8, page e69552 | - SMITH, L. E.; WESOLOWSKI, E.; MCLELLAN, A.; KOSTYK, S. K.; D'AMATO, R.; SULLIVAN, R.; D'AMORE, P. A., "Oxygen-induced retinopathy in the mouse", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (19940000), vol. 35, pages 101 - 111, XP003014482 | - STAHL, A.; CONNOR, K. M.; SAPIEHA, P.; WILLETT, K. L.; KRAH, N. M.; DENNISON, R. J.; CHEN, J.; GUERIN, K. I.; SMITH, L. E. H., "Computer-aided quantification of retinal neovascularization", Angiogenesis, (20090000), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1007/s10456-009-9155-3, pages 297 - 301, XP019745623 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10456-009-9155-3 | - TSUJINO, H.; KONDO, E.; FUKUOKA, T.; DAI, Y.; TOKUNAGA, A.; MIKI, K.; YONENOBU, K.; OCHI, T.; NOGUCHI, K., "Activating transcription factor 3 (ATF3) induction by axotomy in sensory and motoneurons: A novel neuronal marker of nerve injury", Mol. Cell. Neurosci., (20000000), vol. 15, pages 170 - 182 | - UMEDA, N.; KACHI, S.; AKIYAMA, H.; ZAHN, G.; VOSSMEYER, D.; STRAGIES, R.; CAMPOCHIARO, P. A., "Suppression and Regression of Choroidal Neovascularization by Systemic Administration of an α5β1 Integrin Antagonist", Mol. Pharmacol., (20060000), vol. 69, pages 1820 - 1828 | - WALENSKY L. D.; BIRD G. H., "Hydrocarbon-stapled peptides: principles, practice, and progress", J Med Chem., (20140814), vol. 57, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/jm4011675, pages 6275 - 88, XP055146896 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm4011675 | - WANG, W.; WANG, F.; LU, F.; XU, S.; HU, W.; HUANG, J.; GU, Q.; SUN, X., "The antiangiogenic effects of integrin alpha5betal inhibitor (ATN-161) in vitro and in vivo", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (20110000), vol. 52, pages 7213 - 7220 | - ZAHN, G.; VOSSMEYER, D.; STRAGIES, R.; WILLS, M.; WONG, C. G.; LOFFLER, K. U.; ADAMIS, A. P.; KNOLLE, J., "Preclinical evaluation of the novel small-molecule integrin alpha5betal inhibitor JSM6427 in monkey and rabbit models of choroidal neovascularization", Arch. Ophthalmol. Chic. III, (19600000), vol. 127, pages 1329 - 1335 | - ZELENSKY et al., FEBS Journal, (20050000), vol. 272, pages 6179 - 6217 |