EP3558095 - ELECTRODE CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.06.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prolira B.V. Padualaan 8 3584 CH Utrecht / NL | [2019/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUHOKA, Tessa Padualaan 8 3584 CH Utrecht / NL | 02 /
VAN DULLEMEN, Marlies Padualaan 8 3584 CH Utrecht / NL | [2019/44] | Representative(s) | Renkema, Jaap IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [2019/44] | Application number, filing date | 17826237.4 | 21.12.2017 | [2019/44] | WO2017EP84215 | Priority number, date | NL20162018031 | 21.12.2016 Original published format: NL 2018031 | [2019/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018115349 | Date: | 28.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3558095 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3558095 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/0408, A61B5/0478, A61B5/0492 | [2019/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/6833 (EP);
A61B5/273 (US);
A61B5/24 (US);
A61B5/25 (EP);
A61B5/291 (EP,US);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/6832 (US);
H05K1/0216 (US);
H05K1/0296 (US);
A61B2562/0215 (US);
A61B2562/0217 (US);
A61B2562/125 (US);
A61B2562/164 (EP,US);
A61B2562/166 (US);
A61B2562/182 (US);
A61B5/259 (US);
A61B5/282 (US);
H05K1/028 (US);
H05K2201/0715 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENTRÄGER FÜR ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHE MESSUNG | [2019/44] | English: | ELECTRODE CARRIER FOR ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT | [2019/44] | French: | SUPPORT D'ÉLECTRODE POUR MESURE ÉLECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUE | [2019/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/44] | 26.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2017 | AL | 21.10.2020 | CY | 21.10.2020 | CZ | 21.10.2020 | EE | 21.10.2020 | HR | 21.10.2020 | LT | 21.10.2020 | LV | 21.10.2020 | MC | 21.10.2020 | MK | 21.10.2020 | MT | 21.10.2020 | PL | 21.10.2020 | RO | 21.10.2020 | RS | 21.10.2020 | SI | 21.10.2020 | SK | 21.10.2020 | SM | 21.10.2020 | TR | 21.10.2020 | BG | 21.01.2021 | GR | 22.01.2021 | IS | 21.02.2021 | PT | 22.02.2021 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.12.2017 | |
AL | 21.10.2020 | ||
CY | 21.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
MT | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
TR | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SI | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 21.10.2020 | |
CZ | 21.10.2020 | ||
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
MC | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
EE | 21.10.2020 | ||
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 21.10.2020 | |
HR | 21.10.2020 | ||
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RO | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SK | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LT | 21.10.2020 | ||
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
SM | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 21.10.2020 | |
LV | 21.10.2020 | ||
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | LV | 21.10.2020 | |
PL | 21.10.2020 | ||
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
IS | 21.02.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | LV | 21.10.2020 | |
RS | 21.10.2020 | ||
BG | 21.01.2021 | ||
GR | 22.01.2021 | ||
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 21.10.2020 | |
PT | 22.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | PT | 22.02.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0205700 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 19 - page 9, line 1 * [I] 2-22; | [I]US7206630 (TARLER MATTHEW DAVID [US]) [I] 1-22 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 16 ** column 15, line 47 - column 16, line 11 *; | [I]EP1854403 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [I] 1-22 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figure 2a *; | [I]JP2014008166 (MEDEX CO LTD I) [I] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2015056027 (MONICA HEALTHCARE LTD [GB]) [I] 1-22 * page 3, lines 7-30 * * page 4, lines 4-27 * * page 16, lines 14-35 * * page 20, line 9 - page 21, line 9 * |