EP3565964 - METHOD FOR CLEANING AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | [2020/46] |
Former [2019/46] | For all designated states PSA Automobiles SA 2-10 Boulevard de l'Europe 78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAIGLE, Emmanuel 4 Allée Botticelli 92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
DUMONT, Jerome 3 Avenue du 11 Novembre 92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
DJELLAL, Mahe 104 Avenue de L'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2019/46] | Application number, filing date | 17826269.7 | 15.12.2017 | [2019/46] | WO2017FR53603 | Priority number, date | FR20170050085 | 05.01.2017 Original published format: FR 1750085 | [2019/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018127638 | Date: | 12.07.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3565964 | Date: | 13.11.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F01N3/20, F02D41/14, F01N11/00 | [2019/46] | CPC: |
F02D41/1446 (EP);
F01N11/00 (EP);
F01N3/2066 (EP);
F02D41/027 (EP);
F01N2550/00 (EP);
F01N2570/14 (EP);
F01N2610/02 (EP);
F01N2900/102 (EP);
F01N2900/1606 (EP);
F02D2200/0812 (EP);
F02D2200/50 (EP);
F02D2200/501 (EP);
F02D2200/604 (EP);
F02D2200/701 (EP);
F02D2250/11 (EP);
F02D41/0235 (EP);
F02D41/0245 (EP);
F02D41/029 (EP);
F02D41/405 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/46] | Validation states | MA | 29.07.2019 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES ABGASSYSTEMS EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2019/46] | English: | METHOD FOR CLEANING AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2019/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE DECRASSAGE D'UNE LIGNE D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2019/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/46] | 29.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/51] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2010122525 (FUJITA TATSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 2,4,5 * paragraphs [0051] , [0073] - [0094]; figures 1,7 * [A] 1,10; | [IY]US2011146240 (WILHELM DANIEL D [US], et al) [I] 1,10 * paragraphs [0041] , [0050] , [0051] , [0063] - [0068]; figure - * [Y] 3; | [XY]US2011167805 (CHEN KEVIN [US]) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0022] , [0023] , [0027] - [0056]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-5; | [XYI]US2015059317 (MITAL RAHUL [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0052]; figure - * [Y] 2-5 [I] 3-5; | [X]EP2853707 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,10* paragraphs [0048] - [0055]; figures 1-3 * |