|
14.01.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
30.09.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2020 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2019 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2019 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
23.04.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2018 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
04.07.2018 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
04.07.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
03.04.2018 |
Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results |
International Searching Authority |
7 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Communication in Cases for Which No Other Form Is Applicable (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
24 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |