EP3481911 - LIGNIN-BASED PHENOLIC RESIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso Oyj P.O. Box 309 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAFAR, Ashar Årstavägen 37 12052 Årsta / SE | 02 /
ARESKOGH, Dimitri Kronobergsgatan 28 11233 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
EKSTRÖM, Jesper Resare Bengts Plan 3 12145 Johanneshov / SE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Steinrud, Henrik Stora Enso AB Group Intellectual Property Box 9090 65009 Karlstad / SE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17827081.5 | 03.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017IB54006 | Priority number, date | SE20160051025 | 11.07.2016 Original published format: SE 1651025 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011668 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481911 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09J197/00, B27N3/14, C08L97/00, C09J161/06, C07G1/00, C08H7/00, C08L61/06 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B27N3/002 (EP,SE,US);
B27N3/02 (EP,US);
B27N3/14 (US);
B27N3/143 (SE,US);
C07G1/00 (EP,SE,US);
C08G8/38 (EP,US);
C08H6/00 (EP,US);
C08L97/005 (EP,SE,US);
C09D161/34 (US);
C09D7/70 (US);
C09J161/06 (EP,SE,US);
C09J197/005 (EP,SE,US);
C08L61/06 (SE)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | LIGNINBASIERTES PHENOLHARZ | [2019/20] | English: | LIGNIN-BASED PHENOLIC RESIN | [2019/20] | French: | RÉSINE PHÉNOLIQUE À BASE DE LIGNINE | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 28.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9321260 (ALCELL TECH INC [CA], et al); | [I]CA2399171 (SILVACHEM INC [CA]); | [I]US2014296429 (WINTEROWD JACK G [US]); | [I]US2016096985 (KNIGHT JAMES H [US], et al) | International search | [YA]US2011245381 (WINTEROWD JACK G [US], et al); | [A]WO2012136894 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI], et al); | [A]CN104087219 (DEHUA TB NEW DECORATION MATERIAL CO LTD); | [XA]WO2015044528 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]); | [A]WO2015079107 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]); | [XYA]EP2993201 (UPM KYMMENE CORP [FI]); |