EP3484270 - ARCHED STEM SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paskal Technologies Agricultural Cooperative Society Ltd. Sharira St. Park Koren P.O. Box 603 Ind. Zone Ma'alot 2101601 / IL | [2019/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUDLER, Amos Halutz M.P. Bikaat Beit Hakerem Zip 2012100 / IL | 02 /
HORNER, Gal Kibbutz Saar Zip 2280500 / IL | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP 5th Floor, Salisbury Square House 8, Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 17827123.5 | 11.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017IL50782 | Priority number, date | US201662361021P | 12.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662361021 P | [2019/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011797 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484270 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/12 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
A01G9/128 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/21] | A01G9/12, A01G17/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | GEWÖLBTE STIELSTÜTZE | [2020/44] | English: | ARCHED STEM SUPPORT | [2019/21] | French: | SUPPORT DE TIGE ARQUÉ | [2020/44] |
Former [2019/21] | STÜTZE FÜR GEBOGENEN SCHAFT | ||
Former [2019/21] | SUPPORT DE TIGE ARQUÉE | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 28.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]NL8902009 (SAEY W & F KOORDENFAB) [X] 1,2,6-15 * pages 4-6; figures 1-7 * [A] 3-5; | [A]ES1038189U (RUIZ CARMONA MANUEL [ES]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-2 *; | [A]JPH11266715 (NASUNIKKUSU KK) [A] 1-15* figure 4 *; | [XAI]US2005044786 (MASTRONARDI ESTER [CA]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0021]; figures 1-5 * [A] 3-5 [I] 8,10,12-15 | International search | [XY]US5052086 (NASUNO YASUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1, 11-16 * Whole document Whole document * [Y] 2, 6-10; | [Y]WO2014115132 (PASKAL TECHNOLOGIES AGRICULTURAL COOPERATIVE LTD [IL]) [Y] 2, 6-10 * Whole document *; | [A]GB1273231 (BLAGDON JAMES HARVEY) [A] 1-16 * Whole document *; | [A]US2014144076 (DEEB ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-16 * See figs. 4-6 and description thereof *; | [A]US6378175 (VANDERPAN RONALD D [US]) [A] 1-16 * See figure 3 resilient clip with first and second enclosure regions (12 and 14) for support wire and stem (20 and 22). * | by applicant | NL8902009 |