EP3486339 - ALUMINUM ALLOY WIRE, ALUMINUM ALLOY STRANDED WIRE, COVERED ELECTRIC WIRE, AND WIRE HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000, Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000, Amago Koura-cho Inukami-gun, Shiga 522-0242 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIDA Sho c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
MITOSE Kengo c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
SEKIYA Shigeki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17827339.7 | 19.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017JP22495 | Priority number, date | JP20160138088 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016138088 | [2019/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018012208 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3486339 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/00, C22C21/02, C22C21/06, H01B1/02, H01B5/02, H01B5/08, H01B7/00, C22F1/00, C22F1/05, C22F1/08 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
H01B1/023 (EP,US);
C22C21/02 (EP,KR,US);
B21C1/02 (US);
B22D11/003 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C22C21/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (EP,KR,US);
C22F1/08 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01B5/08 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSDRAHT, ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSLITZENDRAHT, UMMANTELTER ELEKTRISCHER DRAHT UND KABELBAUM | [2019/21] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY WIRE, ALUMINUM ALLOY STRANDED WIRE, COVERED ELECTRIC WIRE, AND WIRE HARNESS | [2019/21] | French: | FIL EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM, FIL TORONNÉ EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM, FIL ÉLECTRIQUE GAINÉ, ET FAISCEAU ÉLECTRIQUE | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2019 | Translation filed | 30.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 20.07.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2014020796 (SEKIYA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * paragraph [0060]; example *; table 1 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]US2015213913 (YOSHIDA SHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraph [0058]; example *; claim *; | [XY]US2015235729 (YOSHIDA SHO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-11 * examples 1-14; claims 1,7-10 * [Y] 2-4; | [A]WO2016047617 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * example *; claim *; | [Y]US2016194742 (SEKIYA SHIGEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4 * example *; claim * | International search | [A]JP2010067591 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0043] to [0051]; tables 1 to 2, samples No.1-23, 1-24 & US 2011/0140517 A1 paragraphs [0073] to [0083]; tables 1 to 2, samples No.1-23, 1-24 *; | [A]WO2011052644 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * , paragraphs [0068] to [0082]; tables 1 to 3, sample No.3 & US 2012/0217060 A1 paragraphs [0097] to [0110]; tables 1 to 3, sample No.3 *; | [A]JP2016108612 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 2-3 * , paragraphs [0039] to [0040] (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016108617 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE) [A] 2-3 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0045]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP2017057423 (FUJIKURA LTD) [PA] 1-11* , paragraphs [0066] to [0074]; tables 1 to 4, examples 8 to 9, 18, 26, 35 to 36 (Family: none) * |